Hess v. Progenics Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Erick Hess
Defendant: Progenics Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ann MacDougall, Eric J. Ende, David W. Mims, Gerard Ber, Karen Jean Ferrante, Heinz Mausli, Bradley L. Campbell and Pat Fabbio
Case Number: 1:2019cv11683
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Progenics Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Document filed by Erick Hess..(Monteverde, Juan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bradley L. Campbell waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Document filed by Erick Hess..(Monteverde, Juan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ann MacDougall waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Document filed by Erick Hess..(Monteverde, Juan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. David W. Mims waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Document filed by Erick Hess..(Monteverde, Juan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Eric J. Ende waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Document filed by Erick Hess..(Monteverde, Juan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gerard Ber waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Document filed by Erick Hess..(Monteverde, Juan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Heinz Mausli waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Document filed by Erick Hess..(Monteverde, Juan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Karen Jean Ferrante waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Document filed by Erick Hess..(Monteverde, Juan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Pat Fabbio waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Document filed by Erick Hess..(Monteverde, Juan)
January 29, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Progenics Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service was accepted by Patrick Fabio, Chief Financial Officer. Document filed by Erick Hess. (Monteverde, Juan)
January 10, 2020 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gerard Ber. (dnh)
January 10, 2020 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Heinz Mausli. (dnh)
January 10, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Karen Jean Ferrante. (dnh)
January 10, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pat Fabbio. (dnh)
January 10, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Progenics Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (dnh)
January 10, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ann MacDougall. (dnh)
January 10, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bradley L. Campbell. (dnh)
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David W. Mims. (dnh)
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eric J. Ende. (dnh)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gerard Ber, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Erick Hess. (Monteverde, Juan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Heinz Mausli, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Erick Hess. (Monteverde, Juan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Karen Jean Ferrante, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Erick Hess. (Monteverde, Juan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pat Fabbio, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Erick Hess. (Monteverde, Juan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Progenics Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Erick Hess. (Monteverde, Juan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ann MacDougall, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Erick Hess. (Monteverde, Juan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bradley L. Campbell, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Erick Hess. (Monteverde, Juan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David W. Mims, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Erick Hess. (Monteverde, Juan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eric J. Ende, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Erick Hess. (Monteverde, Juan)
January 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 6, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 6, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-10936-VSB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 23, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Vernon S. Broderick as possibly related to 19-cv-10936. (jgo)
December 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-10936-VSB. Document filed by Erick Hess.(Monteverde, Juan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Monteverde, Juan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gerard Ber, Bradley L. Campbell, Eric J. Ende, Pat Fabbio, Karen Jean Ferrante, Ann MacDougall, Heinz Mausli, David W. Mims, Progenics Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18332151)Document filed by Erick Hess.(Monteverde, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hess v. Progenics Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progenics Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann MacDougall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric J. Ende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Ber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Jean Ferrante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heinz Mausli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Fabbio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Hess
Represented By: Juan Eneas Monteverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?