Knight v. Standard Chartered Bank et al
Plaintiff: Julian Knight, Anshuman Chandra and Julian M. Knight
Defendant: Standard Chartered Bank, Standard Chartered Bank (New York), Standard Chartered Bank (Dubai), Standard Chartered Bank, Dubai and Standard Chartered Bank, New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv11739
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Robert J. Cynkar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18374694. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Robert J. Cynkar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18374694. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Anshuman Chandra, Julian M. Knight.(Cynkar, Robert)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #3 Motion for Patrick M. McSweeney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/27/2019) (va)
December 27, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
December 27, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
December 27, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-11117-PAE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 26, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 18-cv-11117. (jgo)
December 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
December 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Patrick M McSweeney. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Julian M. Knight; Standard Chartered Bank, Dubai; Standard Chartered Bank, New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
December 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Patrick M McSweeney. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
December 26, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #3 MOTION for Patrick M.McSweeney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18348756. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Patrick M.McSweeney re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-11117(PAE). Document filed by Anshuman Chandra, Julian Knight.(McSweeney, Patrick)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Patrick M.McSweeney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18348756. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Anshuman Chandra, Julian Knight.(McSweeney, Patrick)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McSweeney, Patrick)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Standard Chartered Bank, Standard Chartered Bank (Dubai), Standard Chartered Bank (New York). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18347968)Document filed by Julian Knight, Anshuman Chandra.(McSweeney, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight v. Standard Chartered Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Knight
Represented By: Patrick M McSweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anshuman Chandra
Represented By: Patrick M McSweeney
Represented By: Robert J. Cynkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian M. Knight
Represented By: Patrick M McSweeney
Represented By: Robert J. Cynkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Chartered Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Chartered Bank (New York)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Chartered Bank (Dubai)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Chartered Bank, Dubai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Chartered Bank, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?