Mendez v. Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Himelda Mendez
Defendant: Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11756
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Kristina M. Launey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
February 11, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Kristina M. Launey, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18765870. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Kristina M. Launey, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18765870. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kristina M. Launey, Esq., #2 Launey Aff. Ex. A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Launey, Kristina)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. The deadline for Defendant Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to March 12, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File requesting an extension of the deadline to respond to the Complaint, up to and including March 12, 2020 addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from John W. Egan, Esq. dated February 6, 2020. Document filed by Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc...(Egan, John)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John William Egan on behalf of Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc...(Egan, John)
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc. served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, legal clerk. Document filed by Himelda Mendez..(Marks, Bradly)
February 4, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Katherine Polk Failla is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/24/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/14/2020) (va)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.. (dnh)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Himelda Mendez. (Marks, Bradly)
December 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Bradly Gurion Marks to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): enter only the name of the party for whom the summons is being requested in the docket entry text. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
December 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
December 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1:19-cv-11756 Himelda Mendez v. Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Himelda Mendez. (Marks, Bradly) Modified on 12/26/2019 (pne).
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marks, Bradly)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18348772)Document filed by Himelda Mendez.(Marks, Bradly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Himelda Mendez
Represented By: Bradly Gurion Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.
Represented By: John William Egan
Represented By: Kristina Launey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?