Bloom v. Quad/Graphics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Valerie Bloom
Defendant: J. Joel Quadracci, David J. Honan and Quad/Graphics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11860
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (13 in 1:19-cv-10376-VEC, 13 in 1:19-cv-10376-VEC) MOTION to Appoint Alaska Electrical Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-10376-VEC, 1:19-cv-11860-VEC.(Rosenfeld, David)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONSOLIDATING: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The above-captioned actions are consolidated into one action (the "Consolidated Action") for all purposes. All future filings should be made in docket number 19-CV-10376. Any additional submissions by any party regarding the appointment of a lead plaintiff and lead counsel in the Consolidated Action are due no later than January 24, 2020. After a lead plaintiff and lead counsel are named, the Court will set a schedule for Lead Plaintiff to file an Amended Consolidated Complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/10/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-10376-VEC, 1:19-cv-11860-VEC(ama)
January 10, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:19-cv-10376-VEC.. (ama)
January 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 6, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 6, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-10376-VEC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to J. Joel Quadracci. (pc)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David J. Honan. (pc)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Quad/Graphics, Inc.. (pc)
December 30, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Valerie E. Caproni as possibly related to 19cv10376. (pc)
December 30, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 30, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-10376 (VEC). Document filed by Valerie Bloom.(Bleichmar, Javier)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David J. Honan, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Valerie Bloom. (Bleichmar, Javier)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J. Joel Quadracci, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Valerie Bloom. (Bleichmar, Javier)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Quad/Graphics, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Valerie Bloom. (Bleichmar, Javier)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bleichmar, Javier)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David J. Honan, Quad/Graphics, Inc., J. Joel Quadracci. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18376562)Document filed by Valerie Bloom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A)(Bleichmar, Javier)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bloom v. Quad/Graphics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Bloom
Represented By: Javier Bleichmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Joel Quadracci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Honan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quad/Graphics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?