Xu v. Kealoha Sushi Inc et al
Plaintiff: Yong Xu
Defendant: John 02 Doe, Song Chen, John 01 Doe, Ah Niu, Darwin Doe, Kealoha Sushi Inc, Aloha Sushi Inc., Ali Jiu and Jacky Chen
Case Number: 1:2019cv11885
Filed: December 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Stewart D Aaron
Referring Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for general pretrial management. (ECF No. 7.) The parties (or, if no defendants have appeared in the case, only the plaintiff) shall appear for a Telephone Conference on Thursday, February 27, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. to discuss the status of this case. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 212- 805-0110 once all parties are on the line. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 2/18/2020) (js)
January 29, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Aloha Sushi Inc. served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. Service was accepted by STEVE, MANAGER of KEALOHA SUSHI INC. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yong Xu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit: POS Photo of Manager Steve)(Troy, John)
January 29, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Kealoha Sushi Inc served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. Service was accepted by STEVE, MANAGER of KEALOHA SUSHI INC. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yong Xu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit: POS Photo of Manager Steve)(Troy, John)
January 29, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Darwin Doe served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. Service was accepted by STEVE, MANAGER of KEALOHA SUSHI INC. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yong Xu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit: POS Photo of Manager Steve)(Troy, John)
January 29, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. John 02 Doe served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. Service was accepted by STEVE, MANAGER of KEALOHA SUSHI INC. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yong Xu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit: POS Photo of Manager Steve)(Troy, John)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. John 01 Doe served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. Service was accepted by STEVE, MANAGER of KEALOHA SUSHI INC. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yong Xu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit: POS Photo of Manager Steve)(Troy, John)
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Song Chen served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. Service was accepted by STEVE, MANAGER of KEALOHA SUSHI INC d/b/a Kealoha Sushi & Poke Bowl. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Yong Xu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit: POS Photo Manager Steve)(Troy, John)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/30/2019) (rjm)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aloha Sushi Inc., Song Chen, Darwin Doe, John 01 Doe, John 02 Doe, Kealoha Sushi Inc. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Troy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Aloha Sushi Inc.; John 01 Doe; John 02 Doe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney John Troy. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Aloha Sushi, Inc.. The party was added to the case in error. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Troy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); Fee Date 12/29/2019;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Date has been modified to 12/30/2019;. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron B. Schweitzer on behalf of Yong Xu. (Schweitzer, Aaron)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron B. Schweitzer on behalf of Yong Xu. (Schweitzer, Aaron)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KEALOHA SUSHI INC d/b/a Kealoha Sushi & Poke Bowl; and ALOHA SUSHI INC. d/b/a Aloha Sushi & Poke Bowl; SONG CHEN a/k/a Jacky Chen, "JOHN 01 DOE" a/k/a Ah Jiu, "JOHN 02 DOE" a/k/a Ah Niu, and DARWIN "DOE", re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Yong Xu. (Troy, John)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Troy, John)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Song Chen, Darwin Doe, John 01 Doe, John 02 Doe, Kealoha Sushi Inc, Aloha Sushi, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18382417)Document filed by Yong Xu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited)(Troy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xu v. Kealoha Sushi Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 02 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Song Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 01 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ah Niu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darwin Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kealoha Sushi Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aloha Sushi Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Jiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacky Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yong Xu
Represented By: Aaron B. Schweitzer
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?