Stein v. Tiffany & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Shiva Stein
Defendant: Rose Marie Bravo, Roger N. Farah, Abby F. Kohnstamm, James E. Lillie, Jane Hertzmark Hudis, Tiffany & Co., Hafize Gaye Erkan, Alessandro Bogliolo, Robert S. Singer, William A. Shutzer, Annie Young-Scrivner and Rose Marie Bravo CBE
Case Number: 1:2019cv11926
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Notice is hereby given that pursuant to Rule 41(a)(l)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff hereby voluntarily dismisses her individual claims in the above-captioned action (the "Action") with prejudice. Because this notice of dismissal is being filed with the Court before service by Defendants of either an answer or a motion for summary judgment, Plaintiffs dismissal of the Action is effective upon filing of this notice. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/12/2020) (gr)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Alessandro Bogliolo, Hafize Gaye Erkan, Roger N. Farah, Jane Hertzmark Hudis, Abby F. Kohnstamm, James E. Lillie, Rose Marie Bravo CBE, William A. Shutzer, Robert S. Singer, Tiffany & Co., Annie Young-Scrivner. Document filed by Shiva Stein. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Melwani, Gloria)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Alessandro Bogliolo waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020; Hafize Gaye Erkan waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020; Roger N. Farah waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020; Jane Hertzmark Hudis waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020; Abby F. Kohnstamm waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020; James E. Lillie waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020; Rose Marie Bravo CBE waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020; William A. Shutzer waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020; Robert S. Singer waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020; Tiffany & Co. waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020; Annie Young-Scrivner waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. Document filed by Shiva Stein. (Melwani, Gloria)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 3/6/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/2/2020) (gr)
January 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
January 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gloria Kui Melwani. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Rose Marie Bravo. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Melwani, Gloria)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alessandro Bogliolo, Rose Marie Bravo, Hafize Gaye Erkan, Roger N. Farah, Jane Hertzmark Hudis, Abby F. Kohnstamm, James E. Lillie, William A. Shutzer, Robert S. Singer, Tiffany & Co., Annie Young-Scrivner. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18390257)Document filed by Shiva Stein.(Melwani, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. Tiffany & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Marie Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger N. Farah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abby F. Kohnstamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Lillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Hertzmark Hudis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hafize Gaye Erkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessandro Bogliolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Shutzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Young-Scrivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Marie Bravo CBE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiva Stein
Represented By: Gloria Kui Melwani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?