ENFORCEMENT OF PHILIPPINE FORFEITURE JUDGMENT AGAINST ALL ASSETS OF ARELMA, S.A., FORMERLY HELD AT MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH, INCORPORATED, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, ACCOUNT NUMBER 16
Respondent: Philippine National Bank
Intervenor: Jose Duran
Interested Party: United States of America
In Re: Enforcement Of Philippine Forfeiture Judgment Against All Assets Of Arelma, S.A., Formerly Held At Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, Including, But Not Limited To, Account Number 16
Case Number: 1:2019mc00412
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #63 MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by United States of America. (Sohn, Joshua)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #72 Letter filed by Philippine National Bank. ENDORSEMENT: The Court does not intend to decide the proposed motion on the merits without full briefing. If there is some other basis on which PNB wishes to address the letter, it has leave to do so by November 8, 2019. Otherwise, it should inform the Duran parties that it plans to oppose the application on the merits, and the pre-motion conference requirement will be deemed waived. Briefing shall be in accordance with the Court's Individual Practices par. 2.B. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 11/8/2019.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 11/06/2019) (ama)
November 6, 2019 Filing 72 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Michael O. Ware dated November 6, 2019 re: Seeking Leave to Respond to Duran Intervenors-Respondents' Letter (ECF 70) Seeking A Pre-Motion Conference (Non-Discovery). Document filed by Philippine National Bank.(Ware, Michael)
November 1, 2019 Filing 71 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Jeana Roxas as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roger Roxas, Philippine National Bank, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sohn, Joshua)
November 1, 2019 Filing 70 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Robert A. Swift dated November 1, 2019 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Jose Duran.(Swift, Robert)
November 1, 2019 Filing 69 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Daniel J. Brown dated November 1, 2019 re: Briefing Schedule for Roxas Parties' Motion for Leave to Intervene. Document filed by Golden Budha Corporation, Jeana Roxas as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roger Roxas.(Brown, Daniel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 68 RESPONSE re: #1 Registration of Foreign Judgment, Answer Of Respondent Philippine National Bank. Document filed by Philippine National Bank. (Ware, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Filing 67 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Jose Duran. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swift, Robert)
October 29, 2019 Filing 66 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #63 MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Jose Duran. (Swift, Robert)
October 29, 2019 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #63 MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Jose Duran. (Swift, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #63 MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Golden Budha Corporation, Jeana Roxas as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roger Roxas. (Brown, Daniel)
October 24, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION to Intervene . Document filed by Golden Budha Corporation, Jeana Roxas as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roger Roxas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of William Baker, Jr. In Support of Intervention, #2 Exhibit Proposed Answer, #3 Exhibit Hawaii Supreme Court decision, #4 Exhibit Hawaii Special Verdict Form, #5 Exhibit Judgment, #6 Exhibit Amended Judgment, #7 Exhibit Second Amended Judgment, #8 Exhibit Third Amended Judgment, #9 Exhibit Buckley Deposition Transcript)(Brown, Daniel)
October 22, 2019 Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Robert A. Swift dated October 22, 2019 re: Request for Oral Argument on Summary Judgment Motions. Document filed by Jose Duran.(Swift, Robert)
October 21, 2019 Filing 61 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Robert A. Swift dated October 21, 2019 re: Response to Justice Dept's Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Jose Duran.(Swift, Robert)
October 21, 2019 Filing 60 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from United States of America dated 10/21/2019 re: Proposed Rule 12(c) Motion Against Duran Class' Fourth Affirmative Defense. Document filed by United States of America.(Sohn, Joshua)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #56 Letter filed by Jeana Roxas as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roger Roxas, Golden Budha Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: The pre-motion conference requirement is waived. The briefing schedule shall be in accordance with paragraph 2.B of the Court's Individual Practices. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/11/2019) (ama)
October 16, 2019 Filing 58 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from United States of America dated 10/16/2019 re: In re: Enforcement of Philippine Forfeiture Judgment, No. 1:19-mc-412-LAK-GWG. Document filed by United States of America.(Sohn, Joshua)
October 16, 2019 Filing 57 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #46 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment on Statute of Limitations. . Document filed by United States of America. (Sohn, Joshua)
October 11, 2019 Filing 56 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Daniel J. Brown dated October 11, 2019 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Golden Budha Corporation, Jeana Roxas as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roger Roxas.(Brown, Daniel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel J. Brown on behalf of Jeana Roxas as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roger Roxas, Golden Budha Corporation. (Brown, Daniel)
October 9, 2019 Filing 54 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #46 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment on Statute of Limitations., #37 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Jose Duran. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Supplement)(Swift, Robert)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: On or before October 18, 2019, the parties shall confer with each other in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) in an attempt to reach agreement in good faith on a discovery plan. The plan shall be filed on or before November 1, 2019. The deadline for responses to any outstanding requests for discovery shall be measured from the date of the Rule 26(f) conference. See generally Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(2)(B). Following review of the plan, the Court will determine whether it is necessary to hold a scheduling conference or whether it will instead issue a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 16(b)(1)(A). The Court reminds the parties that they must follow its pre-motion conference requirement as reflected in the Court's Individual Practices, 2.A. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/08/2019) (ama)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: denying without prejudice #50 Letter Motion to Compel. Application denied without prejudice to any arguments the Duran Class wish to make in their opposition memorandum regarding whether PNB is entitled to be heard. The Court suggests that the Duran Class also address the arguments made in PNB's memorandum of law on the merits inasmuch as the Court may elect to consider them. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/08/2019) (ama)
October 4, 2019 Filing 51 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from United States of America and Philippine National Bank dated 10/4/2019 re: Case Status and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Philippine National Bank, United States of America.(Sohn, Joshua)
October 4, 2019 Filing 50 LETTER MOTION to Compel Philippine National Bank to Strike ECF # 47 addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Robert A. Swift dated 10/4/2019. Document filed by Jose Duran.(Swift, Robert)
October 4, 2019 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Robert A. Swift dated October 4, 2019 re: Scheduling Order. Document filed by Jose Duran.(Swift, Robert)
October 3, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jonathan Calica on behalf of Philippine National Bank. (Calica, Andrew)
October 2, 2019 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #37 MOTION for Summary Judgment . And in Support of The Government's Cross-Motion #46 . Document filed by Philippine National Bank. (Ware, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Filing 46 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment on Statute of Limitations. Document filed by United States of America. Responses due by 10/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Rule 56.1 Statement)(Sohn, Joshua)
September 27, 2019 Filing 45 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Counsel for United States dated 09/27/2019 re: Enforcement of Philippine Forfeiture Judgment, No. 19-412 (LAK) (GWG). Document filed by United States of America.(Sohn, Joshua)
September 24, 2019 Filing 44 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Robert A. Swift dated September 24, 2019 re: Briefing Schedule for Duran's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Jose Duran.(Swift, Robert)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: The above-referenced action has been referred to the undersigned for general pre-trial purposes as well as for a report and recommendation on any dispositive motions. All pre-trial applications or motions, including those relating to scheduling and discovery, shall be made to the undersigned. All applications or motions must comply with this Court's Individual Practices,which are available through the Clerk's Office or at: www.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Gorenstein. The Court is aware that the intervenor has filed a motion to dismiss the action on statute of limitations grounds. However, the Court would like to hear from the parties by letter as to the current status of this matter, the parties' views as to what actions the parties seek to take in this case, and what other motions will be presented to the Court. The letter should address whether any party seeks to take discovery and whether it would be appropriate to hold a conference under Rule 16. The Court asks that the parties either file a joint letter or, if a joint letter is impractical, separate letters on or before October 5, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 9/24/2019) (ama)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/19/2019) (jca)
September 18, 2019 Filing 41 AFFIRMATION of Federico R. Agcaoili in Support re: #37 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Jose Duran. (Swift, Robert)
September 18, 2019 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Robert A. Swift in Support re: #37 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Jose Duran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Swift, Robert)
September 18, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts. Document filed by Jose Duran.(Swift, Robert)
September 18, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment. Document filed by Jose Duran.(Swift, Robert)
September 18, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Jose Duran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Swift, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey E Glen on behalf of Jose Duran. (Glen, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Jose Duran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Swift, Robert)
September 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
September 9, 2019 Filing 34 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of District of Columbia; Case Number: 1:16-mc-01339. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER of USCA ; USCA Case Number 19-5108. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 32 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #30 Memorandum & Opinion, #31 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Motion to Change Venue; USCA Case Number 19-5108. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. This case comes before the Court upon Proposed Intervenors, Jose Duran and Jenna Roxas's respective Motions to Intervene [Dkt. Nos. 5, 17, respectively]. Proposed Intervernor Duran also filed a Motion for Hearing [Dkt. #15] and a Motion to Change Venue [Dkt. #22]. All motions are fully briefed and ripe for decision. Upon consideration of Proposed Intervenors Duran and Roxas's respective Motions to Intervene, it is hereby ORDERED that, for the reasons stated in the accompanying memorandum opinion, Proposed Intervenor Duran's #5 Motion to Intervene is GRANTED and Proposed Intervenor Roxas's #17 Motion to Intervene is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. UPON CONSIDERATION of Intervenor Duran's #22 Motion to Change Venue, it is further ORDERED that for the reasons stated in the accompanying memorandum opinion, the #22 Motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. UPON CONSIDERATION OF Intervenor Duran's #15 Motion for Hearing, and in light of the Court's decision to transfer the case, it is further ORDERED that the #15 Motion be DENIED as MOOT. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/15/2019. (jth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/15/2019. (jth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER of USCA; USCA Case Number 19-5108. (ztd); (See Order for Details) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE by JOSE DURAN (Swift, Robert) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
April 25, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert A. Swift (Swift, Robert) "form has been forwarded to the Attorney Admissions Section" [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 26 REPLY to opposition to motion re #22 MOTION to Change Venue filed by JOSE DURAN. (Swift, Robert) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #22 MOTION to Change Venue. Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 2/16/2018. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/9/18. (lcrjl3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Motion to Change Venue by JOSE DURAN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healy, Daniel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE re #22 MOTION to Change Venue filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration of Michael Sullivan, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Sohn, Joshua) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
January 19, 2018 Filing 23 ERRATA by JOSE DURAN #22 MOTION to Change Venue filed by JOSE DURAN. (Swift, Robert) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
January 19, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Change Venue by JOSE DURAN (Swift, Robert) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
January 16, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Lee Sohn on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Sohn, Joshua) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 20 REPLY to opposition to motion re #17 MOTION to Intervene as of Right Under FRCP Rule 24(a)(2) filed by JENNA ROSE ROXAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kulik, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition to re #17 MOTION to Intervene as of Right Under FRCP Rule 24(a)(2) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Claman, Daniel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William E. Baker, Jr. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/23/17. (lcrjl3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Williams E. Baker, Jr., Esquire, :Firm- Baker & Baker, APC, :Address- wbaker@lawbaker.com. Phone No. - 714-558-4832. Fax No. - 714-558-7547 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5168973. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Jenna Rose Roxas (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William E. Baker)(Kulik, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION to Intervene as of Right Under FRCP Rule 24(a)(2) by Jenna Rose Roxas (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Kulik, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Request for Decision on Pending Motion by JOSE DURAN re #5 MOTION to Intervene (Swift, Robert) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION for Hearing re #5 MOTION to Intervene , #10 Meet and Confer Statement by JOSE DURAN (Swift, Robert) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
May 26, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Declaration of Notice and Publication by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A FedEx Confirmations, #2 Exhibit B Sample Notice Letter, #3 Exhibit C Declartion of Internet Publication, #4 Exhibit D Affidavits of Newspaper Publication)(Claman, Daniel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
April 24, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Request for Status Conference by JOSE DURAN (Swift, Robert) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
April 17, 2017 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philippine National Bank. (Ware, Michael) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
April 17, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Orth Ware on behalf of Philippine National Bank (Ware, Michael) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 10 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Claman, Daniel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
November 25, 2016 Filing 9 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Non Party Estate of Roger Roxas' Notice of Opposition to Enforcement of Philippine Judgment This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/25/16. (td) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON PUBLICATION AND NOTICE: It is hereby ordered that the #7 United States' Unopposed Motion for Order Authorizing Procedures for Notice and Publication is GRATNED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 09/21/16. (tb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
September 16, 2016 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Order Authorizing Procedures for Notice and Publication by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Claman, Daniel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
September 6, 2016 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Claman, Daniel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit Robert A. Swift Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Robert A. Swift be, and hereby is, admitted pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/22/2016. (lcrjl3, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
August 18, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene by JOSE DURAN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit EX 1 to Motion to Intervene, Robert A. Swift Decl., #3 Exhibit EX 1 to Swift Declaration, #4 Exhibit EX 2 to Swift Declaration, #5 Exhibit EX 3 to Swift Declaration, #6 Exhibit EX 4 to Swift Declaration, #7 Exhibit EX 5 to Swift Declaration, #8 Exhibit EX 6 to Swift Declaration)(Healy, Daniel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
August 16, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert A. Swift, :Firm- Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C., :Address- One South Broad Street, Ste. 2100. Phone No. - 2152381700. Fax No. - 2152381968 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4641106. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOSE DURAN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healy, Daniel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
August 16, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel John Healy on behalf of JOSE DURAN (Healy, Daniel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
August 16, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda D. Orin on behalf of JOSE DURAN (Orin, Rhonda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]
June 27, 2016 Filing 1 REGISTRATION and ENFORCEMENT of Foreign Forfeiture Judgment (Filing fee $ 0.00.) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENFORCEMENT OF PHILIPPINE FORFEITURE JUDGMENT AGAINST ALL ASSETS OF ARELMA, S.A., FORMERLY HELD AT MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH, INCORPORATED, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, ACCOUNT NUMBER 16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jose Duran
Represented By: Rhonda D. Orin
Represented By: Robert A. Swift
Represented By: Daniel John Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States of America
Represented By: Joshua Lee Sohn
Represented By: Daniel Hocker Claman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Philippine National Bank
Represented By: Michael Orth Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Enforcement Of Philippine Forfeiture Judgment Against All Assets Of Arelma, S.A., Formerly Held At Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, Including, But Not Limited To, Account Number 16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?