Liu v. Faraday&Future Inc. et al
Plaintiff: HONG LIU
Defendant: SMART KING LTD., JIAWEI WANG, CHAOYING DENG and FARADAY&FUTURE INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00019
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331sv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Mackenzie Lee Willow-Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18864844. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
February 20, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Mackenzie Lee Willow-Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18864844. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chaoying Deng, Faraday&Future Inc., Smart King Ltd., Jiawei Wang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Willow-Johnson, Mackenzie)
February 14, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Chaoying Deng in Support re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case to the Central District of California.. Document filed by Chaoying Deng, Faraday&Future Inc., Smart King Ltd., Jiawei Wang..(Anziska, Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Jiawei Wang in Support re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case to the Central District of California.. Document filed by Chaoying Deng, Faraday&Future Inc., Smart King Ltd., Jiawei Wang..(Anziska, Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case to the Central District of California. . Document filed by Chaoying Deng, Faraday&Future Inc., Smart King Ltd., Jiawei Wang..(Anziska, Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the alternative., MOTION to Transfer Case to the Central District of California. Document filed by Chaoying Deng, Faraday&Future Inc., Smart King Ltd., Jiawei Wang..(Anziska, Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Faraday&Future Inc., Smart King Ltd...(Anziska, Daniel)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #17 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Chaoying Deng answer due 2/14/2020. Faraday&Future Inc. answer due 2/14/2020. Smart King Ltd. answer due 2/14/2020. Jiawei Wang answer due 2/14/2020. Motions due by 2/14/2020. Responses due by 3/6/2020. Replies due by 3/20/2020.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/23/2020) (jwh)
January 22, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Daniel E. Gorman dated January 22, 2020 re: On Consent Request for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint to February 14, 2020. Document filed by Chaoying Deng, Faraday&Future Inc., Smart King Ltd., Jiawei Wang.(Gorman, Daniel)
January 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel E. Gorman on behalf of Chaoying Deng, Faraday&Future Inc., Smart King Ltd., Jiawei Wang. (Gorman, Daniel)
January 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Nathan Anziska on behalf of Chaoying Deng, Faraday&Future Inc., Smart King Ltd., Jiawei Wang. (Anziska, Daniel)
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Faraday&Future Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. Service was accepted by Brian Fritz. Managing Counsel Litigation & Compliance. Document filed by Hong Liu. (Gold, Dov)
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Smart King Ltd. served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020. Service was accepted by Ricky Scott, Registered Office Agent. Document filed by Hong Liu. (Gold, Dov)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/26/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/6/2020) (va)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dov Byron Gold on behalf of Hong Liu. (Gold, Dov)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Smart King Ltd.. (jgo)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jiawei Wang. (jgo)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Faraday&Future Inc.. (jgo)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chaoying Deng. (jgo)
January 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo)
January 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Amiad Moshe Kushner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Hong Liu; Faraday&Future Inc.; Smart King Ltd.; Jiawei Wang; Chaoying Deng. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
January 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Amiad Moshe Kushner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:78; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SMART KING LTD., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by HONG LIU. (Kushner, Amiad)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHAOYING DENG, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by HONG LIU. (Kushner, Amiad)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JIAWEI WANG, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by HONG LIU. (Kushner, Amiad)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FARADAY&FUTURE INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by HONG LIU. (Kushner, Amiad)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kushner, Amiad)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHAOYING DENG, FARADAY&FUTURE INC., SMART KING LTD., JIAWEI WANG. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18415046)Document filed by HONG LIU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kushner, Amiad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu v. Faraday&Future Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMART KING LTD.
Represented By: Daniel Nathan Anziska
Represented By: Mackenzie Willow-Johnson
Represented By: Daniel E. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIAWEI WANG
Represented By: Daniel Nathan Anziska
Represented By: Mackenzie Willow-Johnson
Represented By: Daniel E. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAOYING DENG
Represented By: Daniel Nathan Anziska
Represented By: Mackenzie Willow-Johnson
Represented By: Daniel E. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARADAY&FUTURE INC.
Represented By: Daniel Nathan Anziska
Represented By: Mackenzie Willow-Johnson
Represented By: Daniel E. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HONG LIU
Represented By: Amiad Moshe Kushner
Represented By: Dov Byron Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?