Bah v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Adama Bah
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 1-10 and City of New York
Case Number: 1:2020cv00263
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katharine H Parker
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 cc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. City of New York answer due 3/30/2020. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/28/2020) (kv)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Carolyn K. Depoian dated 01/28/2020. Document filed by City of New York.(Depoian, Carolyn)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/23/2020 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. The Plaintiff is directed to serve this order, and a copy of the complaint on the Defendants. Plaintiff is also directed to file proof of this service with the court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/16/2020) (ks)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/16/2020) (cf)
January 16, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 16, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 16, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-02334-AT-KHP. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York. (pc)
January 13, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 13, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
January 13, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Analisa Torres as possibly related to 18cv2334. (pc)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Adama Bah. (Harvis, Gabriel)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-2334. Document filed by Adama Bah.(Harvis, Gabriel).
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Harvis, Gabriel)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, John and Jane Doe 1-10. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18475409)Document filed by Adama Bah.(Harvis, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bah v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adama Bah
Represented By: Gabriel Paul Harvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Carolyn Kay Depoian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?