Beaman v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Shelton Beaman
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00309
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346t
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 MARSHALS PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. United States of America served on 1/28/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. Service was accepted by Osrick Gordon, Civ. Clerk, U.S. Attorneys Office, SDNY. Service was alsop made by Cert. Mail to USA, U.S. Dept. of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Ave., Washington, DC 20530. Document filed by Shelton Beaman. (sc)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Shelton Beaman 89-25 Parsons Blvd Queens, NY 11432, at, on 1/27/2020 Re: #5 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (nb)
January 27, 2020 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 1/27/2020 Re: Judge Vernon S. Broderick #5 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) United States of America. (nb)
January 27, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America. (nb)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to issue a summons, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for the United States, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/27/2020) (rro) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
January 24, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 24, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 24, 2020 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Granting IFP Application to Shelton Beaman 89-25 Parsons Blvd Queens, NY 11432. (vba)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/23/2020) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against United States of America. Document filed by Shelton Beaman.(rdz)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Shelton Beaman.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaman v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelton Beaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?