Asciutto et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Plaintiff: Ralph L Barocas, Kathleen Giannone, Raymond Joseph Gormley, Joseph M Krasko, Frank P Henry, Davina Joy Askin, Patricia Murphy-Hess, Jose A Bastidas, David Lynch, Sari Barocas, Christine Marie Codner-Castellano, Jose Alfredo Bastidas, James Joseph Kelly, Jr., Larae Ann Brennan, Bridget Elizabeth Gormley, Shifra Miriam Saruya, Scott M Barocas, Jessica Lemos Machado, Ryan Mark Waters, Michael John Kelly, Connor P Hess, Donna Ann Henry, Gianna Hittmann, Brian Patrick Kelly, Jessyca Brenneisen, Kevin Michael Gormley, Sara Maria Sandstrom, Victoria M Codner, Peggy Waters, Gregory Alan Waters, Jr., Karen A Goggin, Maria Machado, Robert John Hess, Tara Katelyn Goggin, Daniel L Lynch, Penelope Bastidas, Brian H Hess, Robyn Trimarco, Joseph Krasko, Debra J Relyea, Sara Belle Askin, Michael Christopher Henry, Ze Xi Cao, Chase Charles Brenneisen, Leanna Lemos Machado, Mary Lynch, Joann Rios, Kimberly L Hess, William John Gormley, Edith Marie Plaia, Linda MacMenamie, Peter Lynch, Georgia M Asciutto, Joseph Thomas Fitzpatrick, Colleen Kelly, Lizanne Gormley, John Vincent Goggin, Joyce E Barocas, Dong Xi Cao, Jay Relyea, Daniella Lemos Machado, Michael Dennis Goggin and Tracey Lin Jackson
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Case Number: 1:2020cv00411
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Because the Mandelkow Plaintiffs' motions are not currently ripe for review, the Court will not consider the causation and damages issues they present at this time. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/5/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
January 27, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Barry Salzman dated 1/27/20 re: response to Court's request for further information regarding wrongful death claims and to address related issues. Document filed by Georgia M Asciutto(Georgia M. Asciutto, as Representative of the Estate of Stephan Hittman, Deceased), Georgia M Asciutto, Davina Joy Askin, Sara Belle Askin, Sara Belle Askin(Sara Belle Askin, as Representative of the Estate of Haskell Askin, Deceased), Joyce E Barocas(Joyce E. Barocas, as Representative of the Estate of Sheldon Barocas, Deceased), Joyce E Barocas, Ralph L Barocas, Sari Barocas, Scott M Barocas, Jose A Bastidas, Jose Alfredo Bastidas, Penelope Bastidas(Penelope Bastidas, as Representative of the Estate of Mario Bastidas, Deceased), Penelope Bastidas, Larae Ann Brennan, Chase Charles Brenneisen, Chase Charles Brenneisen(Chase Charles Brenneisen, as Representative of the Estate of Ronald Robert Brenneisen, Deceased), Jessyca Brenneisen, Dong Xi Cao, Ze Xi Cao(Ze Xi Cao, as Representative of the Estate of Miao Ling Cao, Decased), Ze Xi Cao, Victoria M Codner, Victoria M Codner(Victoria M. Codner, as Representative of the Estate of Robert Royce Codner, Deceased), Christine Marie Codner-Castellano, Joseph Thomas Fitzpatrick, Kathleen Giannone, John Vincent Goggin, Karen A Goggin(Karen A. Goggin, as Representative of the Estate of John Edward Goggin, Deceased), Karen A Goggin, Michael Dennis Goggin, Tara Katelyn Goggin, Bridget Elizabeth Gormley, Kevin Michael Gormley, Lizanne Gormley, Raymond Joseph Gormley, William John Gormley, Donna Ann Henry, Frank P Henry, Michael Christopher Henry, Brian H Hess, Connor P Hess, Kimberly L Hess, Robert John Hess, Gianna Hittmann, Tracey Lin Jackson, Brian Patrick Kelly, Colleen Kelly(Colleen Kelly, as Representative of the Estate of James Joseph Kelly, Deceased), Colleen Kelly, Michael John Kelly, James Joseph Kelly, Jr., Joseph M Krasko, Joseph M Krasko(Joseph M. Krasko, as Representative of the Estate of Geraldine Krasko, Deceased), Joseph Krasko, Daniel L Lynch, David Lynch, Mary Lynch(Mary Lynch, as Representative of the Estate of Joseph W. Lynch, Deceased), Mary Lynch, Peter Lynch, Linda MacMenamie(Linda MacMenamie, as Representative of the Estate of Duane F. MacMenamie, Deceased), Linda MacMenamie, Daniella Lemos Machado, Jessica Lemos Machado, Leanna Lemos Machado, Maria Machado(Maria Machado, as Representative of the Estate of Alberto Machado, Decased), Maria Machado, Patricia Murphy-Hess, Patricia Murphy-Hess(Patricia Murphy-Hess, as Representative of the Estate of Robert M. Hess, Deceased), Edith Marie Plaia, Edith Marie Plaia(Edith Marie Plaia, as Representative of the Estate of Joseph Francis Fitzpatrick, Deceased), Debra J Relyea(Debra J. Relyea, as Representative of the Estate of Larry Scott Relyea, Deceased), Debra J Relyea, Jay Relyea, Joann Rios, Sara Maria Sandstrom, Shifra Miriam Saruya, Robyn Trimarco, Peggy Waters, Peggy Waters(Peggy Waters, as Representative of the Estate of Gregory Alan Waters, Deceased), Ryan Mark Waters, Gregory Alan Waters, Jr..(Salzman, Barry)
January 22, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Latent Injury Plaintiffs are directed to submit a letter to the Court addressing the issues raised in the PEC's letter, including: (1) what statutory or other authority authorizes the Court to enter a default judgment against Iran without proof of service and an opportunity for Iran to respond to the Short Form Complaint? The letter should specifically address footnote 2 of the PEC's letter and whether and on what basis the Latent Injury Plaintiffs' claims should properly be considered "member cases" to Ashton; and (2) a response to the PEC's arguments with respect to the issues of causation and damages. Here, the Court would benefit from a more substantive analysis than provided in their motion papers. This letter should be filed no later than January 27, 2020. Finally, since November 21, 2019, the Court has attempted to manage the anticipated flood of motions that would be filed in connection with the VSSTF amendments and has established several deadlines to avoid last minute motion practice that raises new and complex questions of law and fact. The Latent Injury Plaintiffs' claims were unanticipated. In light of the complicated issues raised by these claims and the competing demands on the Court's time, the Court does not anticipate issuing any judgments in the Latent Injury Plaintiffs' claims before the February 19, 2020 VSSTF deadline. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/22/2020) (ras)
January 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 22, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 22, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Motions referred to Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/22/2020) (jwh)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Salzman, Barry)
January 16, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Barry Alan Salzman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
January 16, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03MD1570. (pne)
January 16, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
January 16, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Georgia M Asciutto(Georgia M. Asciutto, as Representative of the Estate of Stephan Hittman, Deceased), Georgia M Asciutto, Davina Joy Askin, Sara Belle Askin, Sara Belle Askin(Sara Belle Askin, as Representative of the Estate of Haskell Askin, Deceased), Joyce E Barocas(Joyce E. Barocas, as Representative of the Estate of Sheldon Barocas, Deceased), Joyce E Barocas, Ralph L Barocas, Sari Barocas, Scott M Barocas, Jose A Bastidas, Jose Alfredo Bastidas, Penelope Bastidas(Penelope Bastidas, as Representative of the Estate of Mario Bastidas, Deceased), Penelope Bastidas, Larae Ann Brennan, Chase Charles Brenneisen, Chase Charles Brenneisen(Chase Charles Brenneisen, as Representative of the Estate of Ronald Robert Brenneisen, Deceased), Jessyca Brenneisen, Dong Xi Cao, Ze Xi Cao(Ze Xi Cao, as Representative of the Estate of Miao Ling Cao, Decased), Ze Xi Cao, Victoria M Codner, Victoria M Codner(Victoria M. Codner, as Representative of the Estate of Robert Royce Codner, Deceased), Christine Marie Codner-Castellano, Joseph Thomas Fitzpatrick, Kathleen Giannone, John Vincent Goggin, Karen A Goggin(Karen A. Goggin, as Representative of the Estate of John Edward Goggin, Deceased), Karen A Goggin, Michael Dennis Goggin, Tara Katelyn Goggin, Bridget Elizabeth Gormley, Kevin Michael Gormley, Lizanne Gormley, Raymond Joseph Gormley, William John Gormley, Donna Ann Henry, Frank P Henry, Michael Christopher Henry, Brian H Hess, Connor P Hess, Kimberly L Hess, Robert John Hess, Gianna Hittmann, Tracey Lin Jackson, Brian Patrick Kelly, Colleen Kelly(Colleen Kelly, as Representative of the Estate of James Joseph Kelly, Deceased), Colleen Kelly, Michael John Kelly, James Joseph Kelly, Jr., Joseph M Krasko, Joseph M Krasko(Joseph M. Krasko, as Representative of the Estate of Geraldine Krasko, Deceased), Joseph Krasko, Daniel L Lynch, David Lynch, Mary Lynch(Mary Lynch, as Representative of the Estate of Joseph W. Lynch, Deceased), Mary Lynch, Peter Lynch, Linda MacMenamie(Linda MacMenamie, as Representative of the Estate of Duane F. MacMenamie, Deceased), Linda MacMenamie, Daniella Lemos Machado, Jessica Lemos Machado, Leanna Lemos Machado, Maria Machado(Maria Machado, as Representative of the Estate of Alberto Machado, Decased), Maria Machado, Patricia Murphy-Hess, Patricia Murphy-Hess(Patricia Murphy-Hess, as Representative of the Estate of Robert M. Hess, Deceased), Edith Marie Plaia, Edith Marie Plaia(Edith Marie Plaia, as Representative of the Estate of Joseph Francis Fitzpatrick, Deceased), Debra J Relyea(Debra J. Relyea, as Representative of the Estate of Larry Scott Relyea, Deceased), Debra J Relyea, Jay Relyea, Joann Rios, Sara Maria Sandstrom, Shifra Miriam Saruya, Robyn Trimarco, Peggy Waters, Peggy Waters(Peggy Waters, as Representative of the Estate of Gregory Alan Waters, Deceased), Ryan Mark Waters, Gregory Alan Waters, Jr.. (Salzman, Barry) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Barry Salzman in Support re: #4 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Asciutto Plaintiffs.. Document filed by Georgia M Asciutto(Georgia M. Asciutto, as Representative of the Estate of Stephan Hittman, Deceased), Georgia M Asciutto, Davina Joy Askin, Sara Belle Askin, Sara Belle Askin(Sara Belle Askin, as Representative of the Estate of Haskell Askin, Deceased), Joyce E Barocas(Joyce E. Barocas, as Representative of the Estate of Sheldon Barocas, Deceased), Joyce E Barocas, Ralph L Barocas, Sari Barocas, Scott M Barocas, Jose A Bastidas, Jose Alfredo Bastidas, Penelope Bastidas(Penelope Bastidas, as Representative of the Estate of Mario Bastidas, Deceased), Penelope Bastidas, Larae Ann Brennan, Chase Charles Brenneisen, Chase Charles Brenneisen(Chase Charles Brenneisen, as Representative of the Estate of Ronald Robert Brenneisen, Deceased), Jessyca Brenneisen, Dong Xi Cao, Ze Xi Cao(Ze Xi Cao, as Representative of the Estate of Miao Ling Cao, Decased), Ze Xi Cao, Victoria M Codner, Victoria M Codner(Victoria M. Codner, as Representative of the Estate of Robert Royce Codner, Deceased), Christine Marie Codner-Castellano, Joseph Thomas Fitzpatrick, Kathleen Giannone, John Vincent Goggin, Karen A Goggin(Karen A. Goggin, as Representative of the Estate of John Edward Goggin, Deceased), Karen A Goggin, Michael Dennis Goggin, Tara Katelyn Goggin, Bridget Elizabeth Gormley, Kevin Michael Gormley, Lizanne Gormley, Raymond Joseph Gormley, William John Gormley, Donna Ann Henry, Frank P Henry, Michael Christopher Henry, Brian H Hess, Connor P Hess, Kimberly L Hess, Robert John Hess, Gianna Hittmann, Tracey Lin Jackson, Brian Patrick Kelly, Colleen Kelly(Colleen Kelly, as Representative of the Estate of James Joseph Kelly, Deceased), Colleen Kelly, Michael John Kelly, James Joseph Kelly, Jr., Joseph M Krasko, Joseph M Krasko(Joseph M. Krasko, as Representative of the Estate of Geraldine Krasko, Deceased), Joseph Krasko, Daniel L Lynch, David Lynch, Mary Lynch(Mary Lynch, as Representative of the Estate of Joseph W. Lynch, Deceased), Mary Lynch, Peter Lynch, Linda MacMenamie(Linda MacMenamie, as Representative of the Estate of Duane F. MacMenamie, Deceased), Linda MacMenamie, Daniella Lemos Machado, Jessica Lemos Machado, Leanna Lemos Machado, Maria Machado(Maria Machado, as Representative of the Estate of Alberto Machado, Decased), Maria Machado, Patricia Murphy-Hess, Patricia Murphy-Hess(Patricia Murphy-Hess, as Representative of the Estate of Robert M. Hess, Deceased), Edith Marie Plaia, Edith Marie Plaia(Edith Marie Plaia, as Representative of the Estate of Joseph Francis Fitzpatrick, Deceased), Debra J Relyea(Debra J. Relyea, as Representative of the Estate of Larry Scott Relyea, Deceased), Debra J Relyea, Jay Relyea, Joann Rios, Sara Maria Sandstrom, Shifra Miriam Saruya, Robyn Trimarco, Peggy Waters, Peggy Waters(Peggy Waters, as Representative of the Estate of Gregory Alan Waters, Deceased), Ryan Mark Waters, Gregory Alan Waters, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Salzman, Barry)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Asciutto Plaintiffs. Document filed by Georgia M Asciutto(Georgia M. Asciutto, as Representative of the Estate of Stephan Hittman, Deceased), Georgia M Asciutto, Davina Joy Askin, Sara Belle Askin, Sara Belle Askin(Sara Belle Askin, as Representative of the Estate of Haskell Askin, Deceased), Joyce E Barocas(Joyce E. Barocas, as Representative of the Estate of Sheldon Barocas, Deceased), Joyce E Barocas, Ralph L Barocas, Sari Barocas, Scott M Barocas, Jose A Bastidas, Jose Alfredo Bastidas, Penelope Bastidas(Penelope Bastidas, as Representative of the Estate of Mario Bastidas, Deceased), Penelope Bastidas, Larae Ann Brennan, Chase Charles Brenneisen, Chase Charles Brenneisen(Chase Charles Brenneisen, as Representative of the Estate of Ronald Robert Brenneisen, Deceased), Jessyca Brenneisen, Dong Xi Cao, Ze Xi Cao(Ze Xi Cao, as Representative of the Estate of Miao Ling Cao, Decased), Ze Xi Cao, Victoria M Codner, Victoria M Codner(Victoria M. Codner, as Representative of the Estate of Robert Royce Codner, Deceased), Christine Marie Codner-Castellano, Joseph Thomas Fitzpatrick, Kathleen Giannone, John Vincent Goggin, Karen A Goggin(Karen A. Goggin, as Representative of the Estate of John Edward Goggin, Deceased), Karen A Goggin, Michael Dennis Goggin, Tara Katelyn Goggin, Bridget Elizabeth Gormley, Kevin Michael Gormley, Lizanne Gormley, Raymond Joseph Gormley, William John Gormley, Donna Ann Henry, Frank P Henry, Michael Christopher Henry, Brian H Hess, Connor P Hess, Kimberly L Hess, Robert John Hess, Gianna Hittmann, Tracey Lin Jackson, Brian Patrick Kelly, Colleen Kelly(Colleen Kelly, as Representative of the Estate of James Joseph Kelly, Deceased), Colleen Kelly, Michael John Kelly, James Joseph Kelly, Jr., Joseph M Krasko, Joseph M Krasko(Joseph M. Krasko, as Representative of the Estate of Geraldine Krasko, Deceased), Joseph Krasko, Daniel L Lynch, David Lynch, Mary Lynch(Mary Lynch, as Representative of the Estate of Joseph W. Lynch, Deceased), Mary Lynch, Peter Lynch, Linda MacMenamie(Linda MacMenamie, as Representative of the Estate of Duane F. MacMenamie, Deceased), Linda MacMenamie, Daniella Lemos Machado, Jessica Lemos Machado, Leanna Lemos Machado, Maria Machado(Maria Machado, as Representative of the Estate of Alberto Machado, Decased), Maria Machado, Patricia Murphy-Hess, Patricia Murphy-Hess(Patricia Murphy-Hess, as Representative of the Estate of Robert M. Hess, Deceased), Edith Marie Plaia, Edith Marie Plaia(Edith Marie Plaia, as Representative of the Estate of Joseph Francis Fitzpatrick, Deceased), Debra J Relyea(Debra J. Relyea, as Representative of the Estate of Larry Scott Relyea, Deceased), Debra J Relyea, Jay Relyea, Joann Rios, Sara Maria Sandstrom, Shifra Miriam Saruya, Robyn Trimarco, Peggy Waters, Peggy Waters(Peggy Waters, as Representative of the Estate of Gregory Alan Waters, Deceased), Ryan Mark Waters, Gregory Alan Waters, Jr..(Salzman, Barry)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MD-1570. Document filed by Georgia M Asciutto(Georgia M. Asciutto, as Representative of the Estate of Stephan Hittman, Deceased), Georgia M Asciutto, Davina Joy Askin, Sara Belle Askin, Sara Belle Askin(Sara Belle Askin, as Representative of the Estate of Haskell Askin, Deceased), Joyce E Barocas(Joyce E. Barocas, as Representative of the Estate of Sheldon Barocas, Deceased), Joyce E Barocas, Ralph L Barocas, Sari Barocas, Scott M Barocas, Jose A Bastidas, Jose Alfredo Bastidas, Penelope Bastidas(Penelope Bastidas, as Representative of the Estate of Mario Bastidas, Deceased), Penelope Bastidas, Larae Ann Brennan, Chase Charles Brenneisen, Chase Charles Brenneisen(Chase Charles Brenneisen, as Representative of the Estate of Ronald Robert Brenneisen, Deceased), Jessyca Brenneisen, Dong Xi Cao, Ze Xi Cao(Ze Xi Cao, as Representative of the Estate of Miao Ling Cao, Decased), Ze Xi Cao, Victoria M Codner, Victoria M Codner(Victoria M. Codner, as Representative of the Estate of Robert Royce Codner, Deceased), Christine Marie Codner-Castellano, Joseph Thomas Fitzpatrick, Kathleen Giannone, John Vincent Goggin, Karen A Goggin(Karen A. Goggin, as Representative of the Estate of John Edward Goggin, Deceased), Karen A Goggin, Michael Dennis Goggin, Tara Katelyn Goggin, Bridget Elizabeth Gormley, Kevin Michael Gormley, Lizanne Gormley, Raymond Joseph Gormley, William John Gormley, Donna Ann Henry, Frank P Henry, Michael Christopher Henry, Brian H Hess, Connor P Hess, Kimberly L Hess, Robert John Hess, Gianna Hittmann, Tracey Lin Jackson, Brian Patrick Kelly, Colleen Kelly(Colleen Kelly, as Representative of the Estate of James Joseph Kelly, Deceased), Colleen Kelly, Michael John Kelly, James Joseph Kelly, Jr., Joseph M Krasko, Joseph M Krasko(Joseph M. Krasko, as Representative of the Estate of Geraldine Krasko, Deceased), Joseph Krasko, Daniel L Lynch, David Lynch, Mary Lynch(Mary Lynch, as Representative of the Estate of Joseph W. Lynch, Deceased), Mary Lynch, Peter Lynch, Linda MacMenamie(Linda MacMenamie, as Representative of the Estate of Duane F. MacMenamie, Deceased), Linda MacMenamie, Daniella Lemos Machado, Jessica Lemos Machado, Leanna Lemos Machado, Maria Machado(Maria Machado, as Representative of the Estate of Alberto Machado, Decased), Maria Machado, Patricia Murphy-Hess, Patricia Murphy-Hess(Patricia Murphy-Hess, as Representative of the Estate of Robert M. Hess, Deceased), Edith Marie Plaia, Edith Marie Plaia(Edith Marie Plaia, as Representative of the Estate of Joseph Francis Fitzpatrick, Deceased), Debra J Relyea(Debra J. Relyea, as Representative of the Estate of Larry Scott Relyea, Deceased), Debra J Relyea, Jay Relyea, Joann Rios, Sara Maria Sandstrom, Shifra Miriam Saruya, Robyn Trimarco, Peggy Waters, Peggy Waters(Peggy Waters, as Representative of the Estate of Gregory Alan Waters, Deceased), Ryan Mark Waters, Gregory Alan Waters, Jr..(Salzman, Barry)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Salzman, Barry) Modified on 1/16/2020 (pne).
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18515444)Document filed by Kevin Michael Gormley, Bridget Elizabeth Gormley, Maria Machado(Maria Machado, as Representative of the Estate of Alberto Machado, Decased), Ze Xi Cao(Ze Xi Cao, as Representative of the Estate of Miao Ling Cao, Decased), Debra J Relyea(Debra J. Relyea, as Representative of the Estate of Larry Scott Relyea, Deceased), Joyce E Barocas(Joyce E. Barocas, as Representative of the Estate of Sheldon Barocas, Deceased), Ryan Mark Waters, Kathleen Giannone, Jessyca Brenneisen, Jay Relyea, Chase Charles Brenneisen, Gianna Hittmann, David Lynch, Sara Maria Sandstrom, John Vincent Goggin, Mary Lynch(Mary Lynch, as Representative of the Estate of Joseph W. Lynch, Deceased), Leanna Lemos Machado, Ze Xi Cao, Scott M Barocas, Tara Katelyn Goggin, Raymond Joseph Gormley, Jose A Bastidas, Peggy Waters, Colleen Kelly(Colleen Kelly, as Representative of the Estate of James Joseph Kelly, Deceased), Gregory Alan Waters, Jr., Linda MacMenamie(Linda MacMenamie, as Representative of the Estate of Duane F. MacMenamie, Deceased), Karen A Goggin(Karen A. Goggin, as Representative of the Estate of John Edward Goggin, Deceased), Michael John Kelly, Michael Christopher Henry, Linda MacMenamie, Peter Lynch, Connor P Hess, Jose Alfredo Bastidas, Larae Ann Brennan, Joseph M Krasko, Jessica Lemos Machado, Mary Lynch, Joann Rios, Patricia Murphy-Hess, Tracey Lin Jackson, Robyn Trimarco, Dong Xi Cao, Maria Machado, Daniel L Lynch, Patricia Murphy-Hess(Patricia Murphy-Hess, as Representative of the Estate of Robert M. Hess, Deceased), Debra J Relyea, Edith Marie Plaia, Georgia M Asciutto(Georgia M. Asciutto, as Representative of the Estate of Stephan Hittman, Deceased), Chase Charles Brenneisen(Chase Charles Brenneisen, as Representative of the Estate of Ronald Robert Brenneisen, Deceased), Georgia M Asciutto, Michael Dennis Goggin, Joseph Thomas Fitzpatrick, Karen A Goggin, Shifra Miriam Saruya, Brian H Hess, Penelope Bastidas(Penelope Bastidas, as Representative of the Estate of Mario Bastidas, Deceased), Edith Marie Plaia(Edith Marie Plaia, as Representative of the Estate of Joseph Francis Fitzpatrick, Deceased), Daniella Lemos Machado, James Joseph Kelly, Jr., Christine Marie Codner-Castellano, Joseph M Krasko(Joseph M. Krasko, as Representative of the Estate of Geraldine Krasko, Deceased), Peggy Waters(Peggy Waters, as Representative of the Estate of Gregory Alan Waters, Deceased), Victoria M Codner, Kimberly L Hess, Brian Patrick Kelly, Victoria M Codner(Victoria M. Codner, as Representative of the Estate of Robert Royce Codner, Deceased), Penelope Bastidas, Joyce E Barocas, Davina Joy Askin, William John Gormley, Sari Barocas, Joseph Krasko, Colleen Kelly, Ralph L Barocas, Frank P Henry, Sara Belle Askin, Lizanne Gormley, Donna Ann Henry, Robert John Hess, Sara Belle Askin(Sara Belle Askin, as Representative of the Estate of Haskell Askin, Deceased).(Salzman, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asciutto et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph L Barocas
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Giannone
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Joseph Gormley
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M Krasko
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank P Henry
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davina Joy Askin
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Murphy-Hess
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A Bastidas
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lynch
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sari Barocas
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Marie Codner-Castellano
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alfredo Bastidas
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Joseph Kelly, Jr.
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larae Ann Brennan
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Elizabeth Gormley
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shifra Miriam Saruya
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott M Barocas
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lemos Machado
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Mark Waters
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael John Kelly
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connor P Hess
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Ann Henry
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gianna Hittmann
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Patrick Kelly
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessyca Brenneisen
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Michael Gormley
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Maria Sandstrom
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria M Codner
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Waters
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Alan Waters, Jr.
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen A Goggin
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Machado
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert John Hess
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Katelyn Goggin
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel L Lynch
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penelope Bastidas
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian H Hess
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Trimarco
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Krasko
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra J Relyea
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Belle Askin
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Christopher Henry
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ze Xi Cao
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Charles Brenneisen
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanna Lemos Machado
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lynch
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Rios
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly L Hess
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William John Gormley
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Marie Plaia
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda MacMenamie
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Lynch
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia M Asciutto
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Thomas Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Kelly
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizanne Gormley
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Vincent Goggin
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce E Barocas
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dong Xi Cao
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Relyea
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniella Lemos Machado
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dennis Goggin
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Lin Jackson
Represented By: Barry Alan Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?