Williams v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Tyreke Williams
Defendant: NYPD Officer Jose Deleon Sanchez, The City Of New York,, Franklin Vo, NYPD Officers John/Jane Does ##1-6 and Kieu Vo
Case Number: 1:2020cv00478
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 24 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #23 Letter request for an extension to respond to plaintiff's Complaint. filed by Tyreke Williams. ENDORSEMENT: Time is enlarged to March 29, 2020 for all def'ts., (Franklin Vo answer due 3/29/2020.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/3/20) (yv)
February 28, 2020 Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from F. Vo, dated 2/28/20 re: EXTENSION REQUEST, NUNC PRO TUNC(until 3/29/20). Document filed by Tyreke Williams.(sc) Modified on 3/2/2020 (sc).
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #21 Letter request for an extension of the deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Tyreke Williams. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered., (Kieu Vo answer due 3/19/2020.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/18/20) (yv)
February 14, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from K. Vo, dated 2/14/20 re: (EXTENSION REQUEST) - I am writing to request a one-month extension of the 2/18/20 deadline until 3/19/20 in order to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, because I have begun working with the NYLAG Clinic for pro se litigants. Document filed by Tyreke Williams.(sc)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. So Ordered. (City of New York answer due 4/14/2020; Jose Deleon Sanchez answer due 4/26/2020.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/13/20) (yv) Modified on 2/20/2020 (yv).
February 12, 2020 Filing 19 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with the consent of plaintiff's counsel addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Kiran H. Rosenkilde dated February 12, 2020. Document filed by City of New York..(Rosenkilde, Kiran)
February 12, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Kieu Vo served on 1/25/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service was accepted by John Doe. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Tyreke Williams..(Kuan, Julia)
February 12, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Franklin Vo served on 1/25/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service was accepted by John Doe. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Tyreke Williams..(Kuan, Julia)
February 11, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kiran Hans Rosenkilde on behalf of City of New York..(Rosenkilde, Kiran)
February 5, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Jose Deleon Sanchez served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. Service was accepted by P.R.A.A. Jones, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Tyreke Williams..(Kuan, Julia)
February 3, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. City of New York served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. Service was accepted by Ariton Marke, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Tyreke Williams..(Kuan, Julia)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER WITHDRAWING CASE FROM SECTION 1983 PLAN. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that although this case is, or may be, designated for inclusion in the S.D.N.Y. Local Rule 83.10 Plan (formerly "the Section 1983 plan"), the case shall not so participate. All case tracking deadlines associated with inclusion in the Section 1983 plan are canceled. I will preside over this case in normal fashion, under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rules of Court, and my Individual Rules of Practice. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/23/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Mediation Clerk for processing.
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jose Deleon Sanchez. (sj)
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYPD Officer Jose Deleon Sanchez, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tyreke Williams. (Kuan, Julia)
January 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Julia P. Kuan to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): second party name on the PDF 'To' section must include 'care of c/o' or 'via';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kieu Vo. (jgo)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Franklin Vo. (jgo)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York. (jgo)
January 21, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 21, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 21, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo)
January 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Franklin Vo, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tyreke Williams. (Kuan, Julia)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kieu Vo, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tyreke Williams. (Kuan, Julia)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYPD Officer Jose Deleon Sanchez, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tyreke Williams. (Kuan, Julia) Modified on 1/21/2020 (jgo).
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tyreke Williams. (Kuan, Julia)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kuan, Julia)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John/Jane Does #1-6, Jose Deleon Sanchez, The City Of New York,, Franklin Vo, Kieu Vo. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18536564)Document filed by Tyreke Williams.(Kuan, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyreke Williams
Represented By: Julia P. Kuan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officer Jose Deleon Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Of New York,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Vo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officers John/Jane Does ##1-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kieu Vo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?