Frebet et al v. L'atre Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kairy Dean, Djibrill Sangare, Mike Ndoba, Gregory Roussi, William Wandji and Ludovic Frebet
Defendant: Sebastian Rozec, Maison Harlem, LLC, Harlem Sam, Inc., L'atre Enterprises, Inc., Ayoub Sabdalah, 1590 First Avenue, LLC and Romain Bonnans
Case Number: 1:2020cv00481
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason A Zoldessy on behalf of Romain Bonnans, L'atre Enterprises, Inc., Sebastian Rozec..(Zoldessy, Jason)
February 24, 2020 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Sebastian Rozec waiver sent on 2/19/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. Document filed by Mike Aime Ndoba Icadis; Kairy Dean; Gregory Roussi; Djibrill Sangare; Ludovic Frebet; William Wandji; Boubakar Tiemtore..(Xue, Benjamin)
February 24, 2020 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. L'atre Enterprises, Inc. waiver sent on 2/19/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. Document filed by Mike Aime Ndoba Icadis; Kairy Dean; Gregory Roussi; Djibrill Sangare; Ludovic Frebet; William Wandji; Boubakar Tiemtore..(Xue, Benjamin)
February 24, 2020 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Romain Bonnans waiver sent on 2/19/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. Document filed by Mike Aime Ndoba Icadis; Kairy Dean; Gregory Roussi; Djibrill Sangare; Ludovic Frebet; William Wandji; Boubakar Tiemtore..(Xue, Benjamin)
February 19, 2020 Filing 33 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Boubakar Tiemtore..(Xue, Benjamin)
February 18, 2020 Filing 32 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by William Wandji..(Xue, Benjamin)
February 18, 2020 Filing 31 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Djibrill Sangare..(Xue, Benjamin)
February 18, 2020 Filing 30 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Gregory Roussi..(Xue, Benjamin)
February 18, 2020 Filing 29 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Ludovic Frebet..(Xue, Benjamin)
February 18, 2020 Filing 28 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Mike Aime Ndoba Icadis..(Xue, Benjamin)
February 6, 2020 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sebastian Rozec..(jgo)
February 6, 2020 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Romain Bonnans..(jgo)
February 6, 2020 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to L'atre Enterprises, Inc...(jgo)
February 5, 2020 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Sebastian Rozec, re: #21 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Mike Aime Ndoba Icadis, Kairy Dean, Ludovic Frebet, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, William Wandji..(Xue, Benjamin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to L'ATRE ENTERPRISES, INC., re: #21 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Mike Aime Ndoba Icadis, Kairy Dean, Ludovic Frebet, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, William Wandji..(Xue, Benjamin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Romain Bonnans, re: #21 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Mike Aime Ndoba Icadis, Kairy Dean, Ludovic Frebet, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, William Wandji..(Xue, Benjamin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Romain Bonnans, L'atre Enterprises, Inc., Sebastian Rozec with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Kairy Dean, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, Ludovic Frebet, William Wandji, Mike Aime Ndoba Icadis. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Xue, Benjamin)
January 21, 2020 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ayoub Sabdalah. (pc)
January 21, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1590 First Avenue, LLC. (pc)
January 21, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maison Harlem, LLC. (pc)
January 21, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Romain Bonnans. (pc)
January 21, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sebastian Rozec. (pc)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to L'atre Enterprises, Inc.. (pc)
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harlem Sam, Inc.. (pc)
January 21, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 21, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 21, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
January 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Benjamin B. Xue. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code blank;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201fl;. (pc)
January 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Benjamin B. Xue. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kairy Dean, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, Ludovic Frebet, William Wandji, Mike Ndoba. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
January 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Notice of Intention to Enforce Shareholder Liability re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kairy Dean, Ludovic Frebet, Mike Ndoba, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, William Wandji. (Xue, Benjamin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of DEMAND BY EMPLOYEES TO INSPECT SHARE RECORDS AND MINUTES re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kairy Dean, Ludovic Frebet, Mike Ndoba, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, William Wandji. (Xue, Benjamin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of NOTICE OF LIEN AND ASSIGNMENT re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kairy Dean, Ludovic Frebet, Mike Ndoba, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, William Wandji. (Xue, Benjamin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of DOCUMENT PRESERVATION DEMAND re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kairy Dean, Ludovic Frebet, Mike Ndoba, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, William Wandji. (Xue, Benjamin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1590 First Avenue LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kairy Dean, Ludovic Frebet, Mike Ndoba, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, William Wandji. (Xue, Benjamin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harlem Sam, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kairy Dean, Ludovic Frebet, Mike Ndoba, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, William Wandji. (Xue, Benjamin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maison Harlem, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kairy Dean, Ludovic Frebet, Mike Ndoba, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, William Wandji. (Xue, Benjamin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to L'ATRE ENTERPRISES, INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kairy Dean, Ludovic Frebet, Mike Ndoba, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, William Wandji. (Xue, Benjamin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sebastian Rozec, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kairy Dean, Ludovic Frebet, Mike Ndoba, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, William Wandji. (Xue, Benjamin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Romain Bonnans, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kairy Dean, Ludovic Frebet, Mike Ndoba, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, William Wandji. (Xue, Benjamin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ayoub Sabdalah, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kairy Dean, Ludovic Frebet, Mike Ndoba, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, William Wandji. (Xue, Benjamin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Xue, Benjamin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1590 First Avenue, LLC, Romain Bonnans, Harlem Sam, Inc., L'atre Enterprises, Inc., Maison Harlem, LLC, Sebastian Rozec, Ayoub Sabdalah. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18537209)Document filed by Kairy Dean, Gregory Roussi, Djibrill Sangare, Ludovic Frebet, William Wandji, Mike Ndoba.(Xue, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frebet et al v. L'atre Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kairy Dean
Represented By: Benjamin B. Xue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Djibrill Sangare
Represented By: Benjamin B. Xue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Ndoba
Represented By: Benjamin B. Xue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Roussi
Represented By: Benjamin B. Xue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wandji
Represented By: Benjamin B. Xue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ludovic Frebet
Represented By: Benjamin B. Xue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sebastian Rozec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maison Harlem, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harlem Sam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'atre Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayoub Sabdalah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1590 First Avenue, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romain Bonnans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?