Spencer v. Chung
Plaintiff: Rashawn Maurice Spencer
Defendant: John Chung
Case Number: 1:2020cv00599
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 5/1/2020. Expert Deposition due by 5/22/2020. Fact Discovery due by 3/31/2020. Expert Discovery due by 5/22/2020. Discovery due by 6/2/2020. Status Conference set for 6/19/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/4/2020) (ks)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by John Chung. (Cornacchia, Louis)
January 28, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 28, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 34455/2019E..Document filed by John Chung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B -Defendant Answer, #3 Exhibit C -Defendant Discovery Demands to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit D -Preliminary Conference Order and Case Scheduling)(Cornacchia, Louis)
January 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Louis Thomas Cornacchia. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Rashawn Maurice Spencer, John Chung. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
January 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Louis Thomas Cornacchia. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 09:203; Dollar Demand $250,000; County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1446nr; the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
January 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Louis Thomas Cornacchia to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; Court caption has a typo (Southern Disctrict of New York). Attach the summons and complaint as attachments to the Notice of Removal filing. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 2/3/2020. (pc)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cornacchia, Louis)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 34455/2019E..Document filed by John Chung.(Cornacchia, Louis) Modified on 1/27/2020 (pc).
January 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Louis Thomas Cornacchia to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Notice (Other). The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
January 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Louis Thomas Cornacchia to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint #2 Notice. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 1/29/2020. (pc) Modified on 1/24/2020 (pc).
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - NOTICE of. Document filed by John Chung. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal)(Cornacchia, Louis) Modified on 1/24/2020 (pc).
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against John Chung. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18578071)Document filed by John Chung.(Cornacchia, Louis) Modified on 1/24/2020 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chung
Represented By: Louis Thomas Cornacchia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashawn Maurice Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?