Darling et al v. Northern Tool & Equipment Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Darling, Glenn Darling, CGD Inc., d/b/a Heavy Duty Diesel and Darling Corporation
Defendant: Olympia Tools International Inc. and Northern Tool & Equipment Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00676
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against TGB International, LLC. Document filed by Northern Tool & Equipment Company, Inc...(Druck, Judah)
March 16, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Michael Mealiffe on behalf of Northern Tool & Equipment Company, Inc...(Mealiffe, Thomas)
March 10, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. TGB International, LLC served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. Service was accepted by Rochelle Lusty, Bookeeper. Document filed by Darling Corporation; Christopher Darling; CGD Inc.; Glenn Darling..(Ohliger, Jason)
March 6, 2020 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TGB International, LLC..(sj)
March 6, 2020 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TGB International, LLC, re: #23 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by CGD Inc., Christopher Darling, Glenn Darling, Darling Corporation..(Ohliger, Jason)
March 6, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #21 Amended Complaint, against Northern Tool & Equipment Company, Inc., TGB International, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Darling Corporation, Christopher Darling, CGD Inc., Glenn Darling. Related document: #21 Amended Complaint,..(Ohliger, Jason)
March 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jason Robert Ohliger to RE-FILE Document No. #22 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the summons request was not processed due to the deficient pleading; re-file the summons request after you have correctly re-filed the Amended Complaint. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the summons form PDF. (pne)
March 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jason Robert Ohliger to RE-FILE Document No. #21 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; DO NOT SELECT 'Olympia Tools International Inc.'. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
March 5, 2020 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TGB International, LLC, re: #21 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by CGD Inc., Christopher Darling, Glenn Darling, Darling Corporation..(Ohliger, Jason)
March 5, 2020 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #20 Amended Complaint, against Northern Tool & Equipment Company, Inc., Olympia Tools International Inc., TGB International, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Darling Corporation, Christopher Darling, CGD Inc., Glenn Darling. Related document: #20 Amended Complaint,..(Ohliger, Jason) Modified on 3/6/2020 (pne).
March 5, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents TGB International, LLC added. Party added pursuant to #20 Amended Complaint,.Document filed by Darling Corporation, Christopher Darling, CGD Inc., Glenn Darling. Related document: #20 Amended Complaint,..(Ohliger, Jason)
March 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jason Robert Ohliger to RE-FILE re: Document No. #20 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party TGB International, LLC; all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
March 4, 2020 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #7 Complaint against Northern Tool & Equipment Company, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Darling Corporation, Christopher Darling, CGD Inc., Glenn Darling. Related document: #7 Complaint..(Ohliger, Jason) Modified on 3/5/2020 (jgo).
February 21, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Northern Tool & Equipment Company, Inc...(Druck, Judah)
February 21, 2020 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Northern Tool & Equipment Company, Inc...(Druck, Judah)
February 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judah Adam Druck on behalf of Northern Tool & Equipment Company, Inc...(Druck, Judah)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF OLYMPIA TOOLS INTERNATIONAL, INC. PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Plaintiffs, by and through their counsel, WEINSTEIN, ZIMMERMAN & OBLIGER, hereby voluntarily dismisses this action, with prejudice, as against OLYMPIA TOOLS INTERNATIONAL, INC., only. This dismissal is being provided pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), as no opposing party has served either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Olympia Tolls International, Inc. as a party in this action. SO ORDERED. Olympia Tools International Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/18/2020) (kv)
February 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Jesse M. Furman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt)
February 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Olympia Tools International Inc.. Document filed by Darling Corporation, Christopher Darling, Glenn Darling. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Ohliger, Jason)
February 4, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Olympia Tools International Inc. served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. Service was accepted by Art Doe. Document filed by Darling Corporation; Christopher Darling; CGD Inc.; Glenn Darling..(Ohliger, Jason)
February 4, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Northern Tool & Equipment Company, Inc. served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. Service was accepted by Jane Doe. Document filed by Darling Corporation; Christopher Darling; CGD Inc.; Glenn Darling..(Ohliger, Jason)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on May 6, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/29/20) (yv)
January 29, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Northern Tool & Equipment Company, Inc.. (dnh)
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Northern Tool & Equipment Company, Inc., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by CGD Inc., Christopher Darling, Glenn Darling, Darling Corporation. (Ohliger, Jason)
January 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jason Robert Ohliger to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; the party name listed as to whom the summons is being requested must appear in the as to docket entry exactly as it appears in the caption on the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Northern Tools & Equipment Company, Inc., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by CGD Inc., Christopher Darling, Glenn Darling, Darling Corporation. (Ohliger, Jason) Modified on 1/28/2020 (dnh).
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Olympia Tools International Inc.. (pc)
January 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jason Robert Ohliger to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name on the docket entry must match exactly how the party name appears on the summons form;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
January 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jason Robert Ohliger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CGD Inc., d/b/a Heavy Duty Diesel, Northern Tool & Equipment Co., Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Northern Tool & Equipment Co., Inc., Olympia Tools International Inc.. Document filed by Darling Corporation, Christopher Darling, CGD Inc., d/b/a Heavy Duty Diesel, Glenn Darling.(Ohliger, Jason)
January 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jason Robert Ohliger to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
January 27, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 27, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ohliger, Jason)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CGD Inc., d/b/a Heavy Duty Diesel, Christopher Darling, Glenn Darling, Darling Corporation.(Ohliger, Jason)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CGD Inc., d/b/a Heavy Duty Diesel, Christopher Darling, Glenn Darling, Darling Corporation.(Ohliger, Jason)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Olympia Tools International Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by CGD Inc., d/b/a Heavy Duty Diesel, Christopher Darling, Glenn Darling, Darling Corporation. (Ohliger, Jason)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Northern Tool & Equipment Co. Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by CGD Inc., d/b/a Heavy Duty Diesel, Christopher Darling, Glenn Darling, Darling Corporation. (Ohliger, Jason) Modified on 1/27/2020 (pc).
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18592747)Document filed by Darling Corporation, Christopher Darling, CGD Inc., d/b/a Heavy Duty Diesel, Glenn Darling.(Ohliger, Jason) Modified on 1/27/2020 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darling et al v. Northern Tool & Equipment Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Darling
Represented By: Jason Robert Ohliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Darling
Represented By: Jason Robert Ohliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CGD Inc., d/b/a Heavy Duty Diesel
Represented By: Jason Robert Ohliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darling Corporation
Represented By: Jason Robert Ohliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympia Tools International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Tool & Equipment Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?