Day v. Bar None et al
Plaintiff: Kaitlin Day
Defendant: Frank Steo and Bar None
Case Number: 1:2020cv00683
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331ed
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Bar None and Frank Steo, issued March 13, 2020. (dt)
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Kaitlin Day in Support. Document filed by Kaitlin Day..(Rosenberg, David)
March 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney David Rosenberg to RE-FILE Document #9 Affidavit in Support. Use the event type Declaration in Support of a Non-Motion found under the event list Other Answers. (dt)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 B> FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AFFIDAVIT of Kaitlin Day in Support. Document filed by Kaitlin Day..(Rosenberg, David) Modified on 3/13/2020 (dt).
March 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney David Rosenberg. DO NOT RE-FILE Document No. #8 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavit in Support of the Clerk's Certificate of Dfault not filed. Separately file an Affidavit in Support of the Clerk's Certificate of Default using the event type Affidavit in Support of a Non-Motion found under the event list other answers. (dt)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Kaitlin Day..(Rosenberg, David) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Frank Steo served on 2/4/2020. Service was accepted by Mr. Justin Authorized party. Document filed by Kaitlin Day..(Rosenberg, David)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Bar None served on 2/4/2020. Service was accepted by Mr. Justin Authorized party. Document filed by Kaitlin Day..(Rosenberg, David)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: If a conforming case management plan is submitted at least two business days prior to the scheduled initial conference and subsequently approved by the Court, the initial conference will be canceled automatically. If a motion has been filed either before or after the case management plan is approved, and the parties desire a conference, a letter must be submitted to the Court via fax specifically asking that the initial conference not be canceled. If the parties fail to agree upon such a plan or fail to submit the plan to the Court within the time provided (at least two business days before the conference date), the parties must appear for a conference on 4/10/2020 in courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007 at 10:00 a.m. Initial Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/26/2020) (mml)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bar None, Frank Steo. (pc)
January 27, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 27, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
January 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney David Harry Rosenberg to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Office was not selected. (pc)
January 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Harry Rosenberg. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bar None, Frank Steo, Kaitlin Day. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bar None and Frank Steo, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kaitlin Day. (Rosenberg, David)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rosenberg, David) Modified on 1/27/2020 (pc).
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bar None, Frank Steo. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18593492)Document filed by Kaitlin Day.(Rosenberg, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Day v. Bar None et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Steo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bar None
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlin Day
Represented By: David Harry Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?