Acevedo v. Harvard Maintenance Company et al
Plaintiff: Marcos Acevedo
Defendant: Servete Draztti and Harvard Maintenance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00721
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kevin Nathaniel Fox
Referring Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. Servete Draztti, served on 3/4/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. Service was made by Mail, signed and returned by Brian Rauch, Attorney. Document filed by Marcos Acevedo. (sc)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTION TO MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR PRO SE EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION CASES, re: #5 Mediation Referral Order. Document filed by Marcos Acevedo. (sc)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Marcos Acevedo, at 6812 Yellowstone Blvd Forest Hills, NY 11375, on 2/5/2020 Re: #7 Order of Service, via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (bwa)
February 5, 2020 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 2/5/2020 Re: Judge Alison J. Nathan #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)Harvard Maintenance Company, Servete Draztti, Supervisor. (bwa)
February 5, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Servete Draztti, Harvard Maintenance Company. (bwa)
February 5, 2020 NOTICE of mailing. The court mailed docket number 6 & 7 to Marcos Acevedo at 6812 Yellowstone Blvd, Forest Hills, NY 11375.(qs)
February 4, 2020 Mailed a copy of #5 Mediation Referral Order, to Marcos Acevedo 6812 Yellowstone Blvd Forest Hills, NY 11375..(aea)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Harvard Maintenance Company and Servete Draztti, Supervisor, and deliver to the U.S. Marshals Service all documents necessary to effect service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/4/2020) (kv) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/04/2020) (ama)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR PRO SE EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION CASES: IT IS ORDERED that this pro se case is referred for mediation to the Court's Mediation Program. Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall attempt to locate pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff at the mediation. Pro bono counsel will contact Plaintiff directly. The time to assign a mediator under Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Court's Mediation Program Procedures will be deferred until pro bono counsel has filed a Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. Pro bono counsel will represent Plaintiff solely for purposes of the mediation, and that representation will terminate at the conclusion of the mediation process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection by Plaintiff either to the mediation or to the Court's request for pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff in the mediation must be filed within 14 days of this order. The Court will mail this Order to Plaintiff and that mailing will be noted on the public docket. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/14/2020. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/04/2020) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Mediation Clerk for processing.
February 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
February 3, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
January 30, 2020 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Granting IFP Application to Marcos Acevedo 6812 Yellowstone Blvd Forest Hills, NY 11375. (vba)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/29/2020) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 24, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Servete Draztti, Harvard Maintenance Company. Document filed by Marcos Acevedo. (sac)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Marcos Acevedo. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acevedo v. Harvard Maintenance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servete Draztti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Maintenance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?