Katz v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Henny Katz
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Citibank, N.A., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Barclay's Bank of Delaware and Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00860
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. Service was accepted by CSC Legal Representative. Document filed by Henny Katz..(Kroub, Edward)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, The April 9, 2020 conference is adjourned to June 11, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/20/20) (yv)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. Barclay's Bank of Delaware answer due 4/23/2020. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/25/2020) (ama)
March 24, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #7 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Nana Boyer, Esq. dated March 24, 2020. Document filed by Barclay's Bank of Delaware..(Boyer, Nana)
March 24, 2020 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays, PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays US LLC for Barclay's Bank of Delaware. Document filed by Barclay's Bank of Delaware..(Boyer, Nana)
March 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nana Boyer on behalf of Barclay's Bank of Delaware..(Boyer, Nana)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH DEFENDANT CITIBANK, N.A. Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, plaintiff HENNY KATZ and or their counsel, hereby gives notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice, against defendant CITIBANK, N.A. So Ordered., (Citibank, N.A. terminated.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/19/20) (yv)
March 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge George B. Daniels for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt)
March 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Citibank, N.A.. Document filed by Henny Katz. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Kroub, Edward)
March 9, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal, Agent. Document filed by Henny Katz..(Kroub, Edward)
March 5, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Barclay's Bank of Delaware served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. Service was accepted by Peri Hutt, Agent. Document filed by Henny Katz..(Kroub, Edward)
March 5, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 2/24/2020, answer due 4/24/2020. Document filed by Henny Katz..(Kroub, Edward)
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC..(jgo)
February 26, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Edward Y. Kroub. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Moshe Ovadya Boroosan on behalf of Henny Katz..(Boroosan, Moshe)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, re: #7 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Henny Katz..(Kroub, Edward)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Barclay's Bank of Delaware, Citibank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Henny Katz. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Kroub, Edward)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Citibank, N.A. served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. Service was accepted by Alexis Abbott, Agent. Document filed by Henny Katz..(Kroub, Edward)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/3/2020) (jwh)
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barclay's Bank of Delaware, Citibank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(pne)
February 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
February 3, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., BARCLAYS BANK OF DELAWARE, and CITIBANK, N.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Henny Katz..(Kroub, Edward)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barclay's Bank of Delaware, Citibank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18652289)Document filed by Henny Katz..(Kroub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katz v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclay's Bank of Delaware
Represented By: Nana Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henny Katz
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Represented By: Moshe Ovadya Boroosan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?