Garcon v. Montefiore Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Benito Garcon
Defendant: Community Medical And Dental Care, Inc., Montefiore Medical Center, Montefiore Nyack Hospital, Daniel H Laury, Albert Einstein College of Medicine, Rishi Malhotra, Montefiore Medicine Academic Health System, Inc., Raymond Marcovici, Raymond E. Marcovici and The Nyack Hospital
Case Number: 1:2020cv00980
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Referring Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332mm
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Albert Einstein College of Medicine, Rishi Malhotra, Montefiore Medical Center, Montefiore Medicine Academic Health System, Inc...(Spisek, Milan)
March 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Milan Paul Spisek on behalf of Rishi Malhotra..(Spisek, Milan)
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Milan Paul Spisek on behalf of Albert Einstein College of Medicine, Rishi Malhotra, Montefiore Medical Center, Montefiore Medicine Academic Health System, Inc...(Spisek, Milan)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The April 22, 2020 Initial Case Management Conference at 2:30 pm is converted to a telephonic conference at the same time. The dial-in information is: (866) 390-1828; access code 1582687. Parties are directed to follow ECF 9 regarding procedures for the Rule 26(f) report and file such by April 15, 2020. The Rule 26(f) report should also indicate whether parties would like an early telephonic settlement conference in light of the current COVID-19 pandemic. The Centers for Disease Control and the World Health Organization have advised people to take precautions regarding the COVID-19 pandemic, and the Chief Judge of this Court has entered standing orders regarding the same. See, e.g., 20-MC-155. In order to protect public health while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is hereby ordered that parties and counsel shall conduct work remotely. This includes, but is not limited to, client meetings, work meetings, and hand deliveries of courtesy copies to the Court (courtesy copies can be sent via email or mail). Nothing in this Order prevents the parties from seeking to further modify the pretrial schedule in light of the COVID-19 pandemic (or for any other good cause). Before seeking such relief, the parties must, as always, meet and confer (via remote means) in a good faith effort to reach agreement on how best to fulfill the goals of Rule 1 while avoiding unnecessary health risks. If any party or counsel has any private, personal, familial or medical concerns that they need to share with the Court that would necessitate further orders, they may email Wang_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov ex parte provided that they advise the other parties that they will be contacting the Court ex parte. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 3/26/2020) (rro)
March 4, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Raymond E. Marcovici..(Gallo, Vincent)
March 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent Leonard Gallo, Jr on behalf of Raymond E. Marcovici..(Gallo, Vincent)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: This matter has now been assigned to me for general pretrial. An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Wednesday, April 22, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Parties are directed to complete the Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Case Management Plan, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-ona-t-wang, and file it via ECF one week before the Initial Conference, i.e., by April 15, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 4/22/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 3/3/20) (yv)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Community Medical And Dental Care, Inc., Daniel H Laury..(Braverman, Dylan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Community Medical And Dental Care, Inc...(Braverman, Dylan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Montefiore Nyack Hospital..(Papa, Laura)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Benito Garcon.(Harinstein, Pamela)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pamela Michael Harinstein on behalf of Benito Garcon..(Harinstein, Pamela)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/6/2020) (jca)
February 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu)
February 6, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Braverman, Dylan)
February 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Dylan C. Braverman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
February 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Dylan C. Braverman re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Benito Garcon to CM ECF with the party text "individually". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
February 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Dylan C. Braverman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Benito Garcon, Montefiore Nyack Hospital, Raymond Marcovici. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (pc)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 20742/2020E..Document filed by Community Medical And Dental Care, Inc., Daniel H Laury. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, Bronx County Supreme Court, #3 Certificate of Service by Mail).(Braverman, Dylan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcon v. Montefiore Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Medical And Dental Care, Inc.
Represented By: Dylan C. Braverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montefiore Medical Center
Represented By: Milan Paul Spisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montefiore Nyack Hospital
Represented By: Laura M. Papa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel H Laury
Represented By: Dylan C. Braverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Einstein College of Medicine
Represented By: Milan Paul Spisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rishi Malhotra
Represented By: Milan Paul Spisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montefiore Medicine Academic Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Milan Paul Spisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Marcovici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond E. Marcovici
Represented By: Vincent Leonard Gallo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nyack Hospital
Represented By: Laura M. Papa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benito Garcon
Represented By: Pamela Michael Harinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?