Stein v. Telaria, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shiva Stein
Defendant: Doug Knopper, Rachel Lam, Kevin Thompson, Mark Zagorski, James Rossman, Robert Schechter, Warren Lee, Telaria, Inc. and Paul Caine
Consolidated Plaintiff: Kimberly Robinson, Michael Carter, Esq. James Lin and Yongwen Wu
Case Number: 1:2020cv01010
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting (13) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 1:20-cv-01010-LJL (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01010-LJL, 1:20-cv-01277-LJL (Liman, Lewis)
March 25, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference / Defendants' intent to file motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Sarah M. Lightdale dated March 25, 2020. Document filed by Paul Caine, Doug Knopper, Rachel Lam, Warren Lee, James Rossman, Robert Schechter, Telaria, Inc., Kevin Thompson, Mark Zagorski..(Lightdale, Sarah)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Notice is hereby given that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), plaintiff Michael Carter ("Plaintiff") hereby voluntarily dismisses his claims in the above-captioned consolidated action (the "Action") as moot. This notice of dismissal is being filed with the Court before service by Defendants of either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff Carter's individual claims are hereby dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/25/2020) (rj)
March 25, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis J. Liman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt)
March 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Paul Caine, Doug Knopper, Rachel Lam, Warren Lee, James Rossman, Robert Schechter, Telaria, Inc., Kevin Thompson, Mark Zagorski. Document filed by Michael Carter. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Wilson, James)
March 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Shiva Stein hereby voluntarily dismisses her individual claims in the above-captioned action (the "Action") with prejudice. Because this notice of dismissal is being filed with the Court before service by Defendants of either an answer or a motion for summary judgment, Plaintiff's dismissal of the Action is effective upon filing of this notice. MEMO ENDORSED. Plaintiff Stein's individual claims are hereby dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/24/2020) (va)
March 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. (9 in 1:20-cv-01277-LJL, 9 in 1:20-cv-01010-LJL) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis J. Liman for approval for the following reason(s): that it only dismisses the Lead case and not the consolidated case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01010-LJL, 1:20-cv-01277-LJL(dt)
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Paul Caine, Doug Knopper, Rachel Lam, Warren Lee, James Rossman, Robert Schechter, Telaria, Inc., Kevin Thompson, Mark Zagorski. Document filed by Shiva Stein. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01010-LJL, 1:20-cv-01277-LJL.(Melwani, Gloria)
March 24, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (dt)
March 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Gloria Melwani. RE-FILE Document No. (8 in 1:20-cv-01277-LJL) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Does not list Plaintiff's name in the text, add Plaintiff's name in the text, then, Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01010-LJL, 1:20-cv-01277-LJL(dt)
March 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis J. Liman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Paul Caine, Doug Knopper, Rachel Lam, Warren Lee, James Rossman, Robert Schechter, Telaria, Inc., Kevin Thompson, Mark Zagorski. Document filed by Shiva Stein. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01010-LJL, 1:20-cv-01277-LJL.(Melwani, Gloria) Modified on 3/24/2020 (dt).
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Paul Caine, Doug Knopper, Rachel Lam, Warren Lee, James Rossman, Robert Schechter, Telaria, Inc., Kevin Thompson, Mark Zagorski. Document filed by Kimberly Robinson. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Monteverde, Juan)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: In light of the public health crisis, the Initial Pretrial Conference set for April 2, 2020 at 10:15 a.m. will proceed telephonically. All counsel are directed to call (888) 251-2909 and use Access Code 2123101. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/19/2020) (jca)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The above-captioned cases involve common questions of law and fact. For convenience, expedition, and judicial economy, and noting that no party has objected despite the opportunity to do so, the Court exercises its discretion to consolidate these cases into a single action. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2). The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate all cases listed above under case number 20-cv-01010, and to close all other cases. Counsel are directed to make filings only under case number 20-cv-01010. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/5/2020) (va)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any party objecting to consolidation shall file a letter on ECF, not to exceed two pages, by March 4, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants to answer or move to dismiss any Complaint is ADJOURNED pending further order from the Court. Finally, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, in lieu of the previously-ordered Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, the parties shall confer and submit a proposed plan and schedule for the filing of lead plaintiff motions, a consolidated amended complaint, and briefing on an anticipated Motion to Dismiss the consolidated amended complaint. The Initial Pretrial Conference set for April 2, 2020 at 10:15 a.m. will proceed as scheduled. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/2/2020) (rj)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/2/2020 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/14/2020) (va)
February 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gloria Kui Melwani. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings. (pne)
February 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
February 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Melwani, Gloria)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul Caine, Doug Knopper, Rachel Lam, Warren Lee, James Rossman, Robert Schechter, Telaria, Inc., Kevin Thompson, Mark Zagorski. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18702585)Document filed by Shiva Stein..(Melwani, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. Telaria, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Knopper
Represented By: Sarah Malke Lightdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Lam
Represented By: Sarah Malke Lightdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Thompson
Represented By: Sarah Malke Lightdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zagorski
Represented By: Sarah Malke Lightdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rossman
Represented By: Sarah Malke Lightdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Schechter
Represented By: Sarah Malke Lightdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Lee
Represented By: Sarah Malke Lightdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telaria, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Malke Lightdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Caine
Represented By: Sarah Malke Lightdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiva Stein
Represented By: Gloria Kui Melwani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kimberly Robinson
Represented By: Juan Eneas Monteverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael Carter
Represented By: James Milligan Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Esq. James Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Lifshitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Yongwen Wu
Represented By: Richard Adam Acocelli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?