Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. M.C.F. Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund and Trustees of the Northeast Carpenters Health, Pension, Annuity, Apprenticeship and Labor Management Cooperation Funds
Defendant: M.C.F. Associates, Inc. and Performance Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01033
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Letter, filed by Performance Construction, Inc., M.C.F. Associates, Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' request is hereby granted. Defendants are reminded that pursuant to Rule 1.I of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, all attorneys representing parties are required to register promptly as ECF filers and to enter an appearance in the case. SO ORDERED. M.C.F. Associates, Inc. answer due 4/20/2020; Performance Construction, Inc. answer due 4/20/2020. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/17/2020) (kv)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Clerk of Court from Urban S. Mulvehill dated 3/10/2020 re: On behalf of both defendants in the above action we request an extension of the time to answer the complaint until April 20, 2020. Document filed by M.C.F. Associates, Inc., Performance Construction, Inc..(kv)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Performance Construction, Inc. served on 3/1/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. Service was accepted by Brian McFadden, who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of Performance Construction, Inc.. Document filed by Trustees of the Northeast Carpenters Health, Pension, Annuity, Apprenticeship and Labor Management Cooperation Funds; Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund ; The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 6/12/2020 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/14/2020) (kv)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. M.C.F. Associates, Inc. served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, an authorized person in the Corporation Division of the Department of State. Document filed by Trustees of the Northeast Carpenters Health, Pension, Annuity, Apprenticeship and Labor Management Cooperation Funds; Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund ; The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to M.C.F. Associates, Inc., Performance Construction, Inc...(pc)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the Northeast Carpenters Health, Pension, Annuity, Apprenticeship and Labor Management Cooperation Funds..(Marimon, Nicole)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to M.C.F. Associates, Inc. and Performance Construction, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the Northeast Carpenters Health, Pension, Annuity, Apprenticeship and Labor Management Cooperation Funds..(Marimon, Nicole)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marimon, Nicole)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M.C.F. Associates, Inc., Performance Construction, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18713783)Document filed by Trustees of the Northeast Carpenters Health, Pension, Annuity, Apprenticeship and Labor Management Cooperation Funds, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. M.C.F. Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Northeast Carpenters Health, Pension, Annuity, Apprenticeship and Labor Management Cooperation Funds
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.C.F. Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?