Baez v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Everlidys Baez
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01091
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346t
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED in part. The conference scheduled for April 7, 2020, is adjourned to June 11, 2020, at 10:50 a.m. Per the order at Dkt. No. 6, parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan and joint letter by at least seven days before the conference. Initial Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/30/2020) (cf)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initial Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Guy S. Regev dated 3/27/2020. Document filed by Everlidys Baez. Return Date set for 4/17/2020 at 09:00 AM..(Zucker, Gary)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/7/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/25/2020) (mro)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(sj)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Everlidys Baez..(Regev, Guy)
February 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Guy Shimon Regev to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is blank. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
February 13, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 13, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
February 13, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
February 12, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18779819..(Regev, Guy)
February 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Guy Shimon Regev. Civil Case Opening Fee of $400 Due: for #1 Complaint. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 2/18/2020..(pne)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Everlidys Baez..(Regev, Guy) Modified on 2/13/2020 (pne).
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Regev, Guy)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America. Document filed by Everlidys Baez..(Regev, Guy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everlidys Baez
Represented By: Guy Shimon Regev
Represented By: Gary Alan Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?