Wenger S.A. v. Galaxy Brands LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wenger S.A.
Defendant: Olivet International, Inc. and Galaxy Brands LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01107
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Maxim H. Waldbaum dated 3/31/2020 re: Adjournment of conference. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED in part DENIED in part. The initial conference set for April 9, 2020, at 10:30 A.M. is adjourned to May 7, 2020, at 10:30 A.M. All remaining correspondence must be filed on the docket., (Initial Conference set for 5/7/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/31/2020) (cf)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Galaxy Brands LLC waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. Document filed by Wenger S.A...(Waldbaum, Maxim)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Galaxy Brands LLC, Olivet International, Inc...(dnh)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Galaxy Brands LLC; Olivet International, Inc., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Wenger S.A...(Waldbaum, Maxim)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Maxim Howard Waldbaum to RE-FILE Document No. #10 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the correct official A.O. Summons form dated (06/12). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Galaxy Brands LLC; Olivet International, Inc., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Wenger S.A...(Waldbaum, Maxim) Modified on 3/9/2020 (dnh).
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Maxim Howard Waldbaum to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As To' Error; the docket entry reflects the wrong party as to whom the summons is being requested. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wenger, S.A., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Wenger S.A...(Waldbaum, Maxim) Modified on 3/6/2020 (dnh).
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Waldbaum, Maxim)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Galaxy Brands LLC, Olivet International, Inc.. Document filed by Wenger S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Waldbaum, Maxim)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/25/2020) (rro)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wenger S.A...(Waldbaum, Maxim)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Waldbaum, Maxim)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Maxim Howard Waldbaum to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the incorrect Basis of Jurisdiction code was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Maxim Howard Waldbaum to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Maxim Howard Waldbaum. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Waldbaum, Maxim) Modified on 2/10/2020 (jgo).
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18734020)Document filed by Wenger S.A...(Waldbaum, Maxim) Modified on 2/10/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wenger S.A. v. Galaxy Brands LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivet International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galaxy Brands LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wenger S.A.
Represented By: Maxim Howard Waldbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?