Levinson v. Select Medical Corporation Life and Disability Insurance Plan et al
Plaintiff: M.D. Stephen F Levinson
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of America, Select Medical Corporation Life and Disability Insurance Plan, Lincoln Financial Group, Liberty Mutual and Select Medical
Case Number: 1:2020cv01117
Filed: February 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of America, Liberty Mutual, Lincoln Financial Group, Select Medical, Select Medical Corporation Life and Disability Insurance Plan..(sj)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Select Medical Corporation Life and Disability Insurance Plan, Select Medical, Liberty Life Assurance Company of America, Liberty Mutual, Lincoln Financial Group, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Stephen F Levinson..(Trueman, David)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A at the United States District Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/11/2020) (mro)
February 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Lawrence Trueman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
February 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
February 9, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Trueman, David)
February 9, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Select Medical Corporation Life and Disability Insurance Plan, Select Medical, Liberty Life Assurance Company of America, Liberty Mutual, Lincoln Financial Group, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephen F Levinson.(Trueman, David) Modified on 2/10/2020 (sj).
February 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of America, Liberty Mutual, Lincoln Financial Group, Select Medical, Select Medical Corporation Life and Disability Insurance Plan. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18738713)Document filed by Stephen F Levinson..(Trueman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levinson v. Select Medical Corporation Life and Disability Insurance Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Medical Corporation Life and Disability Insurance Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Financial Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D. Stephen F Levinson
Represented By: David Lawrence Trueman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?