Dominguez et al v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Juan Dominguez
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01275
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the initial pretrial conference will be held telephonically. Prior to the date of the conference, counsel for all parties shall register as filing users in accordance with the Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Counsel for all parties are directed to participate in the initial pretrial conference at the time and using the dial-in instructions listed below. Counsel are directed to confer with each other prior to the conference regarding settlement and each of the other subjects to be considered at a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 conference, and to prepare and file a detailed written proposed schedule for any motions and discovery. If this case has been settled or otherwise terminated, counsel are not required to participate in the conference, provided that a stipulation of discontinuance, voluntary dismissal, or other proof of termination is filed prior to the date of the conference via e-mail to the Orders and Judgments Clerk at the following e-mail address: judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. All conferences with the Court are scheduled for a specific time; there is no other matter scheduled for that time; and counsel are directed to be available promptly. The attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel must participate in the conference. Requests for adjournment shall be made no later than four business days before the conference and shall be made in a letter filed on ECF in accordance with the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules and Instructions. The written submission must (a) specify the reasons for the adjournment, (b) state whether the other parties have consented, and (c) indicate times and dates on succeeding Fridays when all counsel are available. Unless counsel are notified that the conference has been adjourned it will be held as scheduled. YOU ARE DIRECTED (i) TO SO NOTIFY ALL ATTORNEYS IN THIS ACTION BY SERVING UPON EACH OF THEM A COPY OF THIS NOTICE AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES FORTHWITH, AND (ii) TO FILE PROOF OF SUCH NOTICE WITH THE COURT. IF YOU ARE UNAWARE OF THE IDENTITY OF COUNSEL FOR ANY OF THE PARTIES, YOU MUST FORTHWITH SEND A COPY OF THE NOTICE AND PRACTICES TO THAT PARTY PERSONALLY. DATE OF CONFERENCE: APRIL 24, 2020 AT 9 A.M. The parties shall use the following dial-in credentials for the conference. Dial-in: 888-363-4749.Access code: 4324948. The parties shall use a landline if one is available. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/6/2020) (gr)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Bojbasa on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc...(Bojbasa, Michael)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Philip Tumelty on behalf of Juan Dominguez..(Tumelty, John)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc...(Crowley, Michael)
February 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 14, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael J. Crowley. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Juan Dominguez. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
February 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael J. Crowley. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
February 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael J. Crowley re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Juan Dominguez with party text 'individually'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc...(Crowley, Michael)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc..(Crowley, Michael)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Crowley, Michael)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 35331/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18791126).Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Verified Complaint, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service).(Crowley, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominguez et al v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Dominguez
Represented By: John Philip Tumelty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Crowley
Represented By: Michael Bojbasa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?