Lin v. Telaria, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Lin
Defendant: Doug Knopper, Rachel Lam, Kevin Thompson, Mark Zagorski, James Rossman, Robert Schechter, Warren Lee, Telaria, Inc. and Paul Caine
Case Number: 1:2020cv01277
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Paul Caine, Doug Knopper, Rachel Lam, Warren Lee, James Rossman, Robert Schechter, Telaria, Inc., Kevin Thompson, Mark Zagorski. Document filed by James Lin. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Lifshitz, Joshua)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting (13) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 1:20-cv-01010-LJL (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01010-LJL, 1:20-cv-01277-LJL (Liman, Lewis)
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of ATTORNEY CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND LAW FIRM. Document filed by James Lin..(Lifshitz, Joshua)
March 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. (9 in 1:20-cv-01277-LJL, 9 in 1:20-cv-01010-LJL) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis J. Liman for approval for the following reason(s): that it only dismisses the Lead case and not the consolidated case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01010-LJL, 1:20-cv-01277-LJL(dt)
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Paul Caine, Doug Knopper, Rachel Lam, Warren Lee, James Rossman, Robert Schechter, Telaria, Inc., Kevin Thompson, Mark Zagorski. Document filed by Shiva Stein. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01010-LJL, 1:20-cv-01277-LJL.(Melwani, Gloria)
March 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Gloria Melwani. RE-FILE Document No. (8 in 1:20-cv-01277-LJL) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Does not list Plaintiff's name in the text, add Plaintiff's name in the text, then, Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01010-LJL, 1:20-cv-01277-LJL(dt)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Paul Caine, Doug Knopper, Rachel Lam, Warren Lee, James Rossman, Robert Schechter, Telaria, Inc., Kevin Thompson, Mark Zagorski. Document filed by Shiva Stein. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01010-LJL, 1:20-cv-01277-LJL.(Melwani, Gloria)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: In light of the public health crisis, the Initial Pretrial Conference set for April 2, 2020 at 10:15 a.m. will proceed telephonically. All counsel are directed to call (888) 251-2909 and use Access Code 2123101. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/19/2020) (jca)
March 5, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-01010-LJL. (va)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The above-captioned cases involve common questions of law and fact. For convenience, expedition, and judicial economy, and noting that no party has objected despite the opportunity to do so, the Court exercises its discretion to consolidate these cases into a single action. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2). The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate all cases listed above under case number 20-cv-01010, and to close all other cases. Counsel are directed to make filings only under case number 20-cv-01010. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/5/2020) (va)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any party objecting to consolidation shall file a letter on ECF, not to exceed two pages, by March 4, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants to answer or move to dismiss any Complaint is ADJOURNED pending further order from the Court. Finally, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, in lieu of the previously-ordered Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, the parties shall confer and submit a proposed plan and schedule for the filing of lead plaintiff motions, a consolidated amended complaint, and briefing on an anticipated Motion to Dismiss the consolidated amended complaint. The Initial Pretrial Conference set for April 2, 2020 at 10:15 a.m. will proceed as scheduled. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/2/2020) (rj)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/2/2020 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/18/2020) (va)
February 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
February 18, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
February 18, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-01010-LJL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
February 14, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis J. Liman as possibly related to 20-cv-1010. (jgo)
February 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 14, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
February 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua M. Lifshitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Class Action code n (No Class Action Alleged);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Class Action code has been modified to y (Class Action Alleged);. (jgo)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-1010. Document filed by James Lin..(Lifshitz, Joshua)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lifshitz, Joshua)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul Caine, Doug Knopper, Rachel Lam, Warren Lee, James Rossman, Robert Schechter, Telaria, Inc., Kevin Thompson, Mark Zagorski. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18792033)Document filed by James Lin..(Lifshitz, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lin v. Telaria, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Knopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zagorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telaria, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Caine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Lifshitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?