Wallace v. City of New York, Department of Education
Plaintiff: Christopher Wallace
Defendant: City of New York, Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2020cv01424
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mohammad Adil Yaqoob on behalf of City of New York, Department of Education..(Yaqoob, Mohammad)
March 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: City of New York, Department of Education answer due 4/27/2020. (rro)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/19/2020) (rro)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for response till 04/27 addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from M. Adil Yaqoob dated 03/19/2020. Document filed by City of New York, Department of Education..(Yaqoob, Mohammad)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York, Department of Education..(jgo)
February 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clark, Justin)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Wallace..(Clark, Justin)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18846272)Document filed by Christopher Wallace..(Clark, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. City of New York, Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wallace
Represented By: Justin Stedman Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York, Department of Education
Represented By: Mohammad Adil Yaqoob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?