A.M. et al v. New York City Department Of Education
Plaintiff: J.W., M.W. and A.M.
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education ("DOE") and New York City Department Of Education,
Case Number: 1:2020cv01439
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James L Cott
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. The time to respond to the complaint is extended, nunc pro tunc, to May 18, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott)(Text Only Order) (Cott, James)
April 16, 2020 Filing 13 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Mark G. Toews dated April 16, 2020. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education,..(Toews, Mark)
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 COMPLAINT against New York City Department Of Education,. Document filed by J.W.(on behalf of M.W.), A.M.(individually), J.W.(individually), A.M.(on behalf of M.W.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit Exhibit F).(Walsh, Tracey)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Letter Motion to Seal. Plaintiff seeks a temporary seal of the complaint that was filed in this case, because four of the six exhibits attached thereto reveal private information that would identify the plaintiff and thus should be redacted. Plaintiff has herewith provided redacted versions of these four exhibits. Defendant consents to the application. However, the request, as presented, will require that the complaint itself be sealed as well, which does not appear necessary. Accordingly, in order to accomplish the relief plaintiff seeks, the complaint and its exhibits shall be sealed, but plaintiffs counsel is directed to refile the complaint with exhibits C through F in the redacted form submitted hereto as one refiled document. The Clerk is respectfully directed to seal Docket No. 1 so that only the Court and counsel have access to it, and to permit the re-filing of the complaint with its redacted exhibits. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott)(Text Only Order) (Cott, James)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Seal Complaint with Exhibits addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Tracey Spencer Walsh dated 03/23/2020. Document filed by A.M.(individually), A.M.(on behalf of M.W.), J.W.(on behalf of M.W.), J.W.(individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F).(Walsh, Tracey)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Application granted. Deadline extended to April 16, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott)(Text Only Order) (Cott, James)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Michael Pantalony dated March 13, 2020. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education,..(Pantalony, Michael)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Douglas Pantalony on behalf of New York City Department Of Education,..(Pantalony, Michael)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/04/2020) (ama)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department Of Education,..(dnh)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint, served. New York City Department Of Education, served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. Service was accepted by Lemar Reid, Docketing Clerk. Document filed by J.W.(on behalf of M.W.); A.M.(individually); J.W.(individually); A.M.(on behalf of M.W.)..(Walsh, Tracey)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by A.M.(individually), A.M.(on behalf of M.W.), J.W.(on behalf of M.W.), J.W.(individually)..(Walsh, Tracey)
February 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Tracey Spencer Walsh. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: M.W.. The party was added to the case in error. (pc)
February 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Tracey Spencer Walsh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: A.M., J.W.. New York City Department Of Education ("DOE"). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (pc)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Walsh, Tracey)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department Of Education ("DOE"). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18849751)Document filed by J.W.(on behalf of M.W.), A.M., J.W., A.M.(on behalf of M.W.), M.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F).(Walsh, Tracey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.M. et al v. New York City Department Of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education ("DOE")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education,
Represented By: Michael Douglas Pantalony
Represented By: Mark Galen Toews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.W.
Represented By: Tracey Spencer Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.W.
Represented By: Tracey Spencer Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M.
Represented By: Tracey Spencer Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?