Zhang v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Changlai Zhang
Defendant: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Acting Sec. of DHS Chad Wolf, William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv01454
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Simon Nakajima on behalf of William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf..(Nakajima, Simon)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. William Barr served on 2/24/2020, answer due 4/24/2020; Ken Cuccinelli served on 2/24/2020, answer due 4/24/2020; Mark Hazuda served on 2/24/2020, answer due 4/24/2020; Chad Wolf served on 2/24/2020, answer due 4/24/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Changlai Zhang..(Zheng, Taobo)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf..(pc)
February 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Taobo Zheng. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chad Wolf, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, William Barr, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Changlai Zhang..(Zheng, Taobo)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zheng, Taobo)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 FIRST COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18852647).Document filed by Changlai Zhang..(Zheng, Taobo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhang v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hazuda
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Sec. of DHS Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Changlai Zhang
Represented By: Taobo Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?