Neda v. Boy Scouts of America
Plaintiff: Gerard Neda
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01519
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Consent Order and Granting the BSA's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Consent Order).(Kenny, Michael)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of COMMENCEMENT OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING. Document filed by Boy Scouts of America..(Kenny, Michael)
February 21, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 21, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
February 21, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kenny, Michael)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 950151/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18866354).Document filed by Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File).(Kenny, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neda v. Boy Scouts of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Michael Leo Kenny, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Neda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?