IN RE: Residential Capital, LLC
Appellant: North American Specialty Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, Clarendon National Insurance Company, Swiss RE International S.E., Steadfast Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company and Certain Interested Underwriters at LLoyd's, London
Appellee: Steven Mitchell, John Picard, Rush Mitchell, Christie Turner, Rescap Liquidating Trust, Rebecca Picard, Rowena Drennen, Roger Turner, Flora Gaskin and Ruth Mitchell
In Re: Residential Capital, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01645
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION & ORDER re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company, Swiss RE International S.E., St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, Certain Interested Underwriters at LLoyd's, London, North American Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company. For the reasons stated, the motion for leave to appeal is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/10/2020) (va)
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal an Interlocutory Order. Document filed by Rowena Drennen, Flora Gaskin, Ruth Mitchell, Steven Mitchell, John Picard, Rebecca Picard, Christie Turner, Roger Turner..(Walters, Roy)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET with addendum filed. (bmlo)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL AN INTERLOCUTORY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Vivek Chopra dated 02/26/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' Motion, dated February 18, 2020, is extended through and including March 24, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/27/2020) Responses due by 3/24/2020 (ks)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Vivek Chopra dated 02/26/2020. Document filed by Rescap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants's Motion for Leave to Appeal).(Linde, Selena)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. Document filed by Certain Interested Underwriters at LLoyd's, London, Clarendon National Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company, North American Specialty Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Swiss RE International S.E., Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D).(bmlo)
February 25, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (bmlo)
February 25, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bmlo)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bmlo)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Sean H. Lane dated 12/27/2019 and 1/14/2020. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 12-12020 (MG), 15-01025A (SHL). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, Clarendon National Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Swiss RE International S.E., Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Certain Interested Underwriters at LLoyd's, London, Continental Casualty Company, North American Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(bmlo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: Residential Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: North American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul Thomas Curley
Represented By: J. Gregory Lahr
Represented By: Cara Tseng Duffield
Represented By: Scott Anthony Schechter
Represented By: Sharon F. McKee
Represented By: Soo Yeon Kim
Represented By: Jonathan A. Constine
Represented By: Ronald Paltin Schiller
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Klein
Represented By: Patrick Michael Kennell
Represented By: Tamara Mansfield O'Flaherty
Represented By: Kevin Mark Mattessich
Represented By: Samuel Giffin Mann
Represented By: Thorn Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Paul Thomas Curley
Represented By: J. Gregory Lahr
Represented By: Cara Tseng Duffield
Represented By: Scott Anthony Schechter
Represented By: Sharon F. McKee
Represented By: Soo Yeon Kim
Represented By: Jonathan A. Constine
Represented By: Ronald Paltin Schiller
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Klein
Represented By: Patrick Michael Kennell
Represented By: Tamara Mansfield O'Flaherty
Represented By: Kevin Mark Mattessich
Represented By: Samuel Giffin Mann
Represented By: Thorn Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul Thomas Curley
Represented By: J. Gregory Lahr
Represented By: Cara Tseng Duffield
Represented By: Scott Anthony Schechter
Represented By: Sharon F. McKee
Represented By: Soo Yeon Kim
Represented By: Jonathan A. Constine
Represented By: Ronald Paltin Schiller
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Klein
Represented By: Patrick Michael Kennell
Represented By: Tamara Mansfield O'Flaherty
Represented By: Matthew E Mawby
Represented By: Kevin Mark Mattessich
Represented By: Samuel Giffin Mann
Represented By: Thorn Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Clarendon National Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul Thomas Curley
Represented By: J. Gregory Lahr
Represented By: Cara Tseng Duffield
Represented By: Scott Anthony Schechter
Represented By: Sharon F. McKee
Represented By: Soo Yeon Kim
Represented By: Jonathan A. Constine
Represented By: Ronald Paltin Schiller
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Klein
Represented By: Patrick Michael Kennell
Represented By: Tamara Mansfield O'Flaherty
Represented By: Kevin Mark Mattessich
Represented By: Samuel Giffin Mann
Represented By: Thorn Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Swiss RE International S.E.
Represented By: Paul Thomas Curley
Represented By: J. Gregory Lahr
Represented By: Cara Tseng Duffield
Represented By: Scott Anthony Schechter
Represented By: Sharon F. McKee
Represented By: Soo Yeon Kim
Represented By: Jonathan A. Constine
Represented By: Ronald Paltin Schiller
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Klein
Represented By: Patrick Michael Kennell
Represented By: Tamara Mansfield O'Flaherty
Represented By: Kevin Mark Mattessich
Represented By: Samuel Giffin Mann
Represented By: Thorn Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul Thomas Curley
Represented By: J. Gregory Lahr
Represented By: Cara Tseng Duffield
Represented By: Scott Anthony Schechter
Represented By: Sharon F. McKee
Represented By: Soo Yeon Kim
Represented By: Jonathan A. Constine
Represented By: Ronald Paltin Schiller
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Klein
Represented By: Patrick Michael Kennell
Represented By: Tamara Mansfield O'Flaherty
Represented By: Kevin Mark Mattessich
Represented By: Samuel Giffin Mann
Represented By: Thorn Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul Thomas Curley
Represented By: J. Gregory Lahr
Represented By: Cara Tseng Duffield
Represented By: Scott Anthony Schechter
Represented By: Sharon F. McKee
Represented By: Soo Yeon Kim
Represented By: Jonathan A. Constine
Represented By: Ronald Paltin Schiller
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Klein
Represented By: Patrick Michael Kennell
Represented By: Tamara Mansfield O'Flaherty
Represented By: Kevin Mark Mattessich
Represented By: Samuel Giffin Mann
Represented By: Thorn Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Certain Interested Underwriters at LLoyd's, London
Represented By: Paul Thomas Curley
Represented By: J. Gregory Lahr
Represented By: Cara Tseng Duffield
Represented By: Scott Anthony Schechter
Represented By: Sharon F. McKee
Represented By: Soo Yeon Kim
Represented By: Jonathan A. Constine
Represented By: Ronald Paltin Schiller
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Klein
Represented By: Patrick Michael Kennell
Represented By: Tamara Mansfield O'Flaherty
Represented By: Kevin Mark Mattessich
Represented By: Samuel Giffin Mann
Represented By: Thorn Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: Karen W. Renwick
Represented By: Michael B Sichter
Represented By: David Milton Skeens
Represented By: Jason A. Nagi
Represented By: Daniel John Flanigan
Represented By: R. Frederick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Picard
Represented By: Karen W. Renwick
Represented By: Michael B Sichter
Represented By: David Milton Skeens
Represented By: Ronald Bruce Carlson
Represented By: Jason A. Nagi
Represented By: Daniel John Flanigan
Represented By: R. Frederick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rush Mitchell
Represented By: Karen W. Renwick
Represented By: Michael B Sichter
Represented By: David Milton Skeens
Represented By: Daniel John Flanigan
Represented By: R. Frederick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Christie Turner
Represented By: Karen W. Renwick
Represented By: Michael B Sichter
Represented By: David Milton Skeens
Represented By: Ronald Bruce Carlson
Represented By: Jason A. Nagi
Represented By: Daniel John Flanigan
Represented By: R. Frederick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rescap Liquidating Trust
Represented By: Selena J Linde
Represented By: Vivek Chopra
Represented By: Alexis E Danneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rebecca Picard
Represented By: Karen W. Renwick
Represented By: Michael B Sichter
Represented By: David Milton Skeens
Represented By: Ronald Bruce Carlson
Represented By: Jason A. Nagi
Represented By: Daniel John Flanigan
Represented By: R. Frederick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rowena Drennen
Represented By: Karen W. Renwick
Represented By: Michael B Sichter
Represented By: David Milton Skeens
Represented By: Ronald Bruce Carlson
Represented By: Jason A. Nagi
Represented By: Daniel John Flanigan
Represented By: R. Frederick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Roger Turner
Represented By: Karen W. Renwick
Represented By: Michael B Sichter
Represented By: David Milton Skeens
Represented By: Ronald Bruce Carlson
Represented By: Jason A. Nagi
Represented By: Daniel John Flanigan
Represented By: R. Frederick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Flora Gaskin
Represented By: Karen W. Renwick
Represented By: Michael B Sichter
Represented By: David Milton Skeens
Represented By: Ronald Bruce Carlson
Represented By: Jason A. Nagi
Represented By: Daniel John Flanigan
Represented By: R. Frederick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ruth Mitchell
Represented By: Karen W. Renwick
Represented By: Michael B Sichter
Represented By: David Milton Skeens
Represented By: Daniel John Flanigan
Represented By: R. Frederick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Residential Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?