Faria v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Gilberto Faria
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01681
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James L Cott
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332mv
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company. Document filed by Gilberto Faria..(Litman, Robert)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert A. Litman on behalf of Gilberto Faria..(Litman, Robert)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial pretrial conference is adjourned to June 30 at 11 a.m., on consent. The conference will proceed by telephone, as previously ordered. As this case was removed, plaintiffs counsel has not yet filed a notice of appearance on the docket and therefore will not be receiving electronic notification of this filing or any other court filings until he does so. Accordingly, counsel for defendant is directed to provide plaintiffs counsel with a copy of this text order. In addition, plaintiffs counsel is hereby directed to file a notice of appearance forthwith, and once done, to file the operative complaint on the docket as a standalone document (as it only appears as an exhibit to the removal papers on the docket). (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott)(Text Only Order) (Cott, James)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Currently Scheduled for April 30, 2020 addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Peter J. Fazio, Counsel for Ford Motor Company dated March 31, 2020. Document filed by Ford Motor Company..(Fazio, Peter)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16: The Court shall hold an initial case management conference in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a), on April 30, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel should contact chambers using the Courts conference line, (877) 873-8017 (Access Code: 5277586). (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 4/30/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 3/25/2020) (jca)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/24/2020) (ama)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Ford Motor Company..(Fazio, Peter)
March 5, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so redesignated. (wb)
March 5, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
February 27, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 27, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Ford Motor Company. Document filed by Ford Motor Company..(Fazio, Peter)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fazio, Peter)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 151458/20. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18921423).Document filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Summons and Complaint).(Fazio, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faria v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Peter Joseph Fazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Faria
Represented By: Robert A. Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?