Francis v. National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Plaintiff: Andre Francis
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01713
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No additional parties may be joined after or Amended Pleadings may be filed until 5/22/2020. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than 9/1/2020. Depositions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30, 31 shall be completed by 8/3/2020. If you have identified types of experts in question 9(a), all expert discovery shall be completed no later than 10/16/2020. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 4 days. On 10/30/2020 at 9:30 A.M. a pre-motion conference will be held for any anticipated dispositive motions, as further set forth in this Order. Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 5/22/2020. Deposition due by 8/3/2020. Fact Discovery due by 9/1/2020. Expert Discovery due by 10/16/2020. Pre-Motion Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/20/2020) (cf)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's statement in the joint letter, regarding Plaintiff's request to conduct depositions by telephone or other remote means, shall be deemed to satisfy the requirement to file a responsive letter by April 21, 2020, per the Order at Dkt. No. 9. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's request is denied without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the April 23, 2020 initial pretrial conference is cancelled. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/20/2020) (cf)
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Sean Constable dated April 15, 2020 re: Joint Letter and Proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by Andre Francis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order).(Wietzke, Marc)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Patrick Constable on behalf of Andre Francis..(Constable, Sean)
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Sean Constable dated April 14, 2020 re: revised request for pre-motion conference. Document filed by Andre Francis..(Constable, Sean)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice to renewal #8 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference: Application DENIED without prejudice to renewal. Plaintiff's letter does not comply with the Individual Rules, which prescribe a process for discovery disputes beginning with a letter not to exceed three pages. Any renewed letter must be filed by April 14, 2020. Defendant shall file a responsive letter by April 21, 2020, per the Individual Rules. The matter will be discussed at the initial pre-trial conference currently scheduled for April 23, 2020. Both parties are reminded that their joint pre-conference materials are due April 16, 2020, per the Order at Dkt. No. 5. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/9/2020) (jwh)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to conduct depositions by remote means addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Marc Wietzke dated April 8, 2020. Document filed by Andre Francis..(Wietzke, Marc)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by National Railroad Passenger Corp...(Bonventre, John)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. National Railroad Passenger Corp. waiver sent on 2/27/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. Document filed by Andre Francis..(Wietzke, Marc)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/23/2020 at 10:50 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/6/2020) (cf)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Railroad Passenger Corp...(dnh)
February 27, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
February 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
February 27, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wietzke, Marc)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Railroad Passenger Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Andre Francis..(Wietzke, Marc)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18932180)Document filed by Andre Francis..(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Represented By: John Anthony Bonventre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Francis
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Represented By: Sean Patrick Constable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?