PVD Phase II LLC v. Silver Arch Capital Partners LLC et al
Plaintiff: PVD Phase II LLC
Defendant: Silver Arch Capital Partners LLC and Jeffrey Wolfer
Case Number: 1:2020cv01720
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332oc
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, June 26, 2020 at 3:00pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Initial Conference set for 6/26/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/1/2020) (rjm)
April 1, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED ANSWER to with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Silver Arch Capital Partners LLC, Jeffrey Wolfer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A.Term Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B.Loan Offer Letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C.Loan Application).(Bernstein, Hartley)
March 24, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #18 Counterclaim. Document filed by PVD Phase II LLC..(Traflet, Stephen)
March 24, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen G. Traflet on behalf of PVD Phase II LLC..(Traflet, Stephen)
March 10, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against PVD Phase II LLC. Document filed by Silver Arch Capital Partners LLC..(Bernstein, Hartley)
February 27, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
February 27, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
February 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
February 27, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
February 27, 2020 Filing 17 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Oklahoma Western; Case Number: 5:19-cv-00836. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ~ Granting #9 Motion to Transfer Venue and Motion to Dismiss. The claims against Mr. Wolfer are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The remaining claims are TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by Honorable Bernard Jones on 2/26/2020. (dwl) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Bernard Jones for all further proceedings. Honorable Robin J. Cauthron no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 01/03/20. (wh) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY by Defendants Silver Arch Capital Partners LLC, Jeffrey Wolfer re #9 MOTION for Order (I) to Transfer Venue, or, in the Alternative, Dismiss this Action and (II) to Dismiss the Complaint against Defendant Jeffrey Wolfer Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(2) Based Upon Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Brief in Support filed by Silver Arch Capital Partners LLC, Jeffrey Wolfer. (Johnson, Crystal) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for Order (I) to Transfer Venue, or, in the Alternative, Dismiss this Action and (II) to Dismiss the Complaint against Defendant Jeffrey Wolfer Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(2) Based Upon Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Brief in Support filed by PVD Phase II LLC. (Avery, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Hartley T Bernstein on behalf of Silver Arch Capital Partners LLC, Jeffrey Wolfer (Bernstein, Hartley) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 Receipt for Money Received from Silver Arch Capital Partners LLC, Jeffrey Wolfer in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500076904 regarding #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hartley Bernstein (kmt) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Hartley T. Bernstein. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 10/31/19. (wh) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Order (I) to Transfer Venue, or, in the Alternative, Dismiss this Action and (II) to Dismiss the Complaint against Defendant Jeffrey Wolfer Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(2) Based Upon Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Brief in Support by Silver Arch Capital Partners LLC, Jeffrey Wolfer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Hartley Bernstein, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Term Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Loan Offer, #5 Exhibit 5 - Loan App)(Johnson, Crystal) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hartley Bernstein by Silver Arch Capital Partners LLC, Jeffrey Wolfer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Johnson, Crystal) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Crystal A Johnson on behalf of Silver Arch Capital Partners LLC, Jeffrey Wolfer (Johnson, Crystal) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PVD Phase II LLC. Jeffrey Wolfer served on 9/20/2019. (Avery, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PVD Phase II LLC. Silver Arch Capital Partners LLC served on 9/20/2019. (Avery, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by PVD Phase II LLC . (Avery, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Silver Arch Capital Partners LLC, Jeffrey Wolfer. (em) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael K Avery on behalf of PVD Phase II LLC (Avery, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]
September 10, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2994579. (Avery, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Silver Arch Capital Partners LLC, Jeffrey Wolfer filed by PVD Phase II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PVD Phase II LLC v. Silver Arch Capital Partners LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Arch Capital Partners LLC
Represented By: Crystal A Johnson
Represented By: Hartley T. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Wolfer
Represented By: Hartley T. Bernstein
Represented By: Crystal A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PVD Phase II LLC
Represented By: Michael K Avery
Represented By: Stephen G. Traflet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?