Lopez v. Shades Of Green LLC
Plaintiff: Samuel Lopez
Defendant: Shades Of Green LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02175
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Referring Judge: Katharine H Parker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The initial case management conference scheduled for July 24, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby rescheduled to July 22, 2020 at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Plaintiff is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Defendant. Initial Conference set for 7/22/2020 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/7/2020) (mro)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: On March 13, 2020, the Court scheduled an initial case management conference for May 11, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. In light of the fact that Defendant Shades of Green LLC has not yet appeared in this case, the May 11, 2020 conference is adjourned to July 24, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. The parties are directed to call (866) 434-5269 and use access code 4858267. Plaintiff is directed to file a letter on ECF by no later than May 15, 2020 advising the Court whether he has been able to contact Defendant and apprising the Court of the efforts he has made to contact Defendant. Plaintiff is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Defendant. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 7/24/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/5/2020) (jca)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ORDER: This action is scheduled for an Initial Case Management Telephone Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Monday, May 11, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parker's Chambers at the scheduled time with counsel for all parties on the line. Please dial 212-805-0234. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/13/2020) (cf)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/13/2020) (rro)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shades Of Green LLC..(pc)
March 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHADES OF GREEN LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Samuel Lopez..(Barducci, Maria Costanza)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Barducci, Maria Costanza)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shades Of Green LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19078657)Document filed by Samuel Lopez..(Barducci, Maria Costanza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Shades Of Green LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shades Of Green LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Lopez
Represented By: Maria Costanza Barducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?