Theallet et al v. H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Sofia T. Inc. and Sophie Theallet
Defendant: H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P. and H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB
Case Number: 1:2020cv02212
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #70 MOTION for James E. Gillenwater to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
May 6, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION for James E. Gillenwater to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Corrected To appear Corrected for James E. Gillenwater, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Florida, #3 Exhibit 2- Certificate of Good Standing DC, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of NY, #5 Text of Proposed Order Granting Corrected Pro Hac Vice).(Gillenwater, James)
May 1, 2020 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Edvin Thungren in Support re: #63 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - H&M 000064-7_, #2 Exhibit B - H&M_000032, 046-052, #3 Exhibit C - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit D - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit E - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit F - H&M_000019, 27, and 149).(Wadyka, Steven)
May 1, 2020 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Solana Leguizamon in Support re: #63 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FIled Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B - H&M_000064-073, #3 Exhibit C - H&M_000032, 046-052, #4 Exhibit D - Filed Under Seal).(Wadyka, Steven)
May 1, 2020 Filing 67 DECLARATION of Rafael Pilati in Support re: #63 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - H&M_000019, 27, and 149, #2 Exhibit C - H&M_000163, #3 Exhibit D - H&M_000161, #4 Exhibit E - H&M_000162).(Wadyka, Steven)
May 1, 2020 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Steven J. Wadyka in Support re: #63 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Form VA to Copyright Reg, #3 Exhibit C - ST Design, #4 Exhibit D - Email to Copyright Office, #5 Exhibit E - Grandmother Photo, #6 Exhibit F - Bathtub Article, #7 Exhibit G - Baththub Article, #8 Exhibit H - Baththub Article, #9 Exhibit I - Baththub Article, #10 Exhibit J - Baththub Article, #11 Exhibit K -Baththub Article, #12 Exhibit L - Baththub Article, #13 Exhibit M - Baththub Article, #14 Exhibit N - Bathtub Article, #15 Exhibit O - Cannes Snapchat Post, #16 Exhibit P - Gabrielle Union Instagram, #17 Exhibit Q - Greta Gerwig, #18 Exhibit R - Lauren Cohan, #19 Exhibit S - Lauaren Cohan, #20 Exhibit T - ST000317-ST000321, #21 Exhibit U - Copycat Instagram, #22 Exhibit V - Filed Under Seal, #23 Exhibit W - Filed Under Seal, #24 Exhibit X - Filed Under Seal, #25 Exhibit Y - Plantiffs' Amended & Supplemental Responses to First Interrogatories).(Wadyka, Steven)
May 1, 2020 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #63 MOTION for Summary Judgment . REDACTED. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P...(Wadyka, Steven)
May 1, 2020 Filing 64 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P...(Wadyka, Steven)
May 1, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P...(Wadyka, Steven)
May 1, 2020 Filing 62 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Edvin Thungren in Support re: #56 LETTER MOTION to Seal and Redact Documents addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Steven Wadyka dated May 1, 2020.. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P., Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ethno Techno Design Brief, #2 Exhibit B - Public Flowers H&M, #3 Exhibit C (4) Exhibit D (5) Exhibit E - Interlineated Email H&M, #6 Exhibit F - Public Design in Both Sizes H&M)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #56 .(Wadyka, Steven) Modified on 5/4/2020 (ad).
May 1, 2020 Filing 61 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Solana Leguizamon in Support re: #56 LETTER MOTION to Seal and Redact Documents addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Steven Wadyka dated May 1, 2020.. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P., Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trend Report, #2 Exhibit B - Design Brief With Metadata, #3 Exhibit C - Flowers H&M, #4 Exhibit D - Interlineated Email)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #56 .(Wadyka, Steven)
May 1, 2020 Filing 60 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Rafael Pilato in Support re: #56 LETTER MOTION to Seal and Redact Documents addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Steven Wadyka dated May 1, 2020.. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P., Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Public Design in Both Sizes, #2 Exhibit C - Public CASTOR Screenshot H&M, #3 Exhibit D - Public CASTOR 28-304 H&M, #4 Exhibit E - Public CASTOR 76-238 H&M)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #56 .(Wadyka, Steven)
May 1, 2020 Filing 59 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Steven J. Wadyka in Support re: #56 LETTER MOTION to Seal and Redact Documents addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Steven Wadyka dated May 1, 2020.. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P., Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Form VA To Copyright Registration, #3 Exhibit C - ST Design ST000005, #4 Exhibit D - Email To Copyright Office, #5 Exhibit E - Grandmother Photo, #6 Exhibit F -- Bathtub Article ST0003365-ST00068, #7 Exhibit G - Bathtub Article ST 000369-ST000372, #8 Exhibit H - Baththub Article ST000373-ST000374, #9 Exhibit I - Bathtub Article ST000375-ST000379, #10 Exhibit J - Bathtub Article ST000380-ST000384, #11 Exhibit K - Bathtub Article, #12 Exhibit L - Bathtub Article, #13 Exhibit M - Bathtub Article, #14 Exhibit N - Bathtub Article, #15 Exhibit O - Cannes snapchat post, #16 Exhibit P - Gabrielle Union Instagram, #17 Exhibit Q - Greta Gerwig ST000095, #18 Exhibit R - Lauren Cohan ST000096, #19 Exhibit S- PR EMAIL for Lauren Cohan, #20 Exhibit T - PR EMail #2, #21 Exhibit U - Copycat Unstagram, #22 Exhibit V - Sealed Milk Sketch, #23 Exhibit W - Sealed Leviosa Sketch, #24 Exhibit X - Sealed w HL-Non-Interlineated May 10 Email, #25 Exhibit Y - Pltfs' Amended & Supplemental Responses to First Interrogatories)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #56 .(Wadyka, Steven)
May 1, 2020 Filing 58 ***SELECTED PARTIES***RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P., Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #56 .(Wadyka, Steven)
May 1, 2020 Filing 57 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #56 LETTER MOTION to Seal and Redact Documents addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Steven Wadyka dated May 1, 2020. . Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P., Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #56 .(Wadyka, Steven)
May 1, 2020 Filing 56 LETTER MOTION to Seal and Redact Documents addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Steven Wadyka dated May 1, 2020. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G To be Sealed, #2 Exhibit H - Memorandum of Law To Be Sealed, #3 Exhibit I - Rule 56.1 To Be Sealed, #4 Exhibit J - Leguizamon Declaration To Be Sealed, #5 Exhibit K - Thungren Declaration To Be Sealed, #6 Exhibit L - Pilati Declaration To Be Sealed).(Wadyka, Steven)
May 1, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #55 MOTION for James E. Gillenwater to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19651514. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Florida Supreme Court and the DC Certificate is unclear;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (laq)
April 30, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for James E. Gillenwater to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19651514. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1 - COGS court notice, #3 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit 3 - COGS email, #5 Text of Proposed Order).(Gillenwater, James)
April 29, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/24/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 29, 2020 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/24/2020 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2020..(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record during the April 24, 2020 conference, Plaintiffs' motion to compel production of documents, Dkt. No. 48, is granted. Defendants are ordered to produce documents responsive to Request Nos. 3-5 of Plaintiffs' First Requests for Production by May 25, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
April 24, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 4/24/2020. (Daniels, Anthony)
April 17, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/19/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 17, 2020 Filing 50 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/19/2020 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/8/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2020..(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 17, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 4/24/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (cf)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application granted. The Court will hold a conference call regarding Plaintiff's proposed motion on April 24, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules related to the COVID-19 pandemic, which are available on the Court's website, for dial-in numbers for the conference and other relevant information. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/17/2020) (cf)
April 16, 2020 Filing 48 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Compel addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Lauren J. Harrison dated 04/16/2020. Document filed by Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet..(Harrison, Lauren)
April 3, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 4/3/2020. (Daniels, Anthony)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. Defendants' March 30, 2020 request for leave to file a motion for summary judgment, Dkt. No. 42, is granted. The deadline for Defendants to file and serve their motion is May 1, 2020. Plaintiffs' opposition is due within three weeks after service of Defendants' motion; Defendant's reply, if any, is due within one week after service of Plaintiffs' opposition. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
April 1, 2020 Filing 46 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Lauren J. Harrison dated 04/01/2020 re: #42 LETTER MOTION for Conference By Telephone requesting leave to file a motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Steven J. Wadyka, Jr. dated 03/30/2020. . Document filed by Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet..(Harrison, Lauren)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #42 Letter Motion for Conference. Application granted. The Court will hold a teleconference regarding Defendants' proposed motion for summary judgment on April 3, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules related to the COVID-19 pandemic, which are available on the Court's website, for dial-in numbers for the conference and other relevant information. Telephone Conference set for 4/3/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/31/2020) (mro)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/31/2020) (mro)
March 30, 2020 Filing 43 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Judge Woods, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Redline).(Harrison, Lauren)
March 30, 2020 Filing 42 LETTER MOTION for Conference By Telephone requesting leave to file a motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Steven J. Wadyka, Jr. dated 03/30/2020. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P...(Wadyka, Steven)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan is submitted by the parties in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3). All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). All Fact Discovery due by 9/4/2020. Deposition due by 9/4/2020. All Expert Discovery due by 11/1/2020. Motions due by 12/1/2020. The parties expect that this case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 3-4 days. A Status Conference set for 11/16/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/24/2020) (ama)
March 23, 2020 Filing 40 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet..(Harrison, Lauren)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Bina B. Palnitkar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Steven J. Wadyka, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
March 19, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #36 MOTION for Jeffrey J. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
March 19, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #37 MOTION for Lauren Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #36 MOTION for Jeffrey J. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 19, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Lauren Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of L. Harrison, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order proposed order).(Harrison, Lauren)
March 19, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Jeffrey J. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of J. Phillips, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order proposed order).(Phillips, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #35 MOTION for Jeffrey J. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19164750. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #34 MOTION for Lauren J. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19164046. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
March 19, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Jeffrey J. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19164750. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of J. Phillips, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order proposed order).(Phillips, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Lauren J. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19164046. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of L. Harrison, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order proposed order).(Harrison, Lauren)
March 18, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for Bina B. Palnitkar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19155757. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
March 18, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Bina B. Palnitkar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19155757. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 - Texas Bar, #3 Exhibit 2 - Texas, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Palnitkar, Bina)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. The teleconference scheduled for March 19, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. will be held via conference call. The Court will send the dial-in information for this call to counsel of record by email. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
March 16, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #31 MOTION for Steven J. Wadyka, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19128621. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 16, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Steven J. Wadyka, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19128621. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Steven Wadyka, Jr. in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Wadyka, Steven)
March 13, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie Pamela Bookbinder on behalf of H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P...(Bookbinder, Julie)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. The Court will hold a telephone conference in this case on March 19, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties are also directed to review the Court's template Case Management Plan, and they should expect to discuss how the current schedule can fit within the framework of the Court's template Case Management Plan. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
March 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sjo)
March 12, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
March 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
March 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
March 12, 2020 Filing 28 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Texas Southern; Case Number: 4:19-cv-02155. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
March 9, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to USDC SD/NY. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 3/9/2020, filed. (gclair, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #13 Motion to TRANSFER CASE to USDC SD/NY. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Abate by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes & Mauritz, AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Motion to Abate)(Palnitkar, Bina) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #24 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed Order)(Harrison, Lauren) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes & Mauritz, AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P., filed.(Palnitkar, Bina) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Dismissal as to H&M Hennes & Mauritz, AB by Sophie Theallet, Sofia T. Inc., filed. (Harrison, Lauren) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Steven J. Wadyka, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Steven J. Wadyka, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes & Mauritz, AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Palnitkar, Bina) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury Trial. Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2019. Pltf Expert Report due by 10/2/2020. Deft Expert Report due by 11/13/2020. Discovery due by 9/4/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/25/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/18/2021. Docket Call set for 2/5/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett Jury Trial set for 2/8/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alfred H Bennett. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 10/4/2019. Motion to Dismiss taken under advisement. Counsel to confer and submit proposed scheduling order dates by the end of the day. Appearances:Steve Wadyka. Bina B Palnitkar, Lauren J Harrison.(Court Reporter: F. Warner), filed.(ledwards, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet, filed.(Harrison, Lauren) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to #16 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, filed by H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P.. (Palnitkar, Bina) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer Case filed by Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet. (Harrison, Lauren) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 8/9/2019..(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed Order)(Harrison, Lauren) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer Case by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes & Mauritz, AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Nelson)(Palnitkar, Bina) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes & Mauritz, AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P., filed.(Palnitkar, Bina) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Bina B. Palnitkar on behalf of H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, H&M Hennes & Mauritz, AB, H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P., filed. (Palnitkar, Bina) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sofia T. Inc., Sophie Theallet, filed.(Harrison, Lauren) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Issuance of Summons as to H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P., filed.(Harrison, Lauren) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon)(hlerma, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Register of Copyrights, AO-121, Notified, filed. (ckrus, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to H&M Hennes & Mauritz, AB, filed.(Harrison, Lauren) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB, filed.(Harrison, Lauren) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P., filed.(Harrison, Lauren) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22617121) filed by Sophie Theallet, Sofia T. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrison, Lauren) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/12/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theallet et al v. H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&M Hennes and Mauritz, L.P.
Represented By: Steven J Wadyka, Jr
Represented By: Bina B Palnitkar
Represented By: Bina Palnitkar
Represented By: James Gillenwater
Represented By: Steven J. Wadyka, Jr.
Represented By: Julie Pamela Bookbinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&M Hennes & Mauritz GBC AB
Represented By: Steven J Wadyka, Jr
Represented By: Bina B Palnitkar
Represented By: Bina Palnitkar
Represented By: James Gillenwater
Represented By: Steven J. Wadyka, Jr.
Represented By: Julie Pamela Bookbinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofia T. Inc.
Represented By: Lauren J Harrison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jay Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophie Theallet
Represented By: Lauren J Harrison
Represented By: Jeffrey Jay Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?