Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. J.H. Reid General Contractor
Petitioner: The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund and The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Respondent: J.H. Reid General Contractor
Case Number: 1:2020cv02230
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,, served. J.H. Reid General Contractor served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, authorized person in the Corporation Department of State. Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund ; The New York City District Council of Carpenters; The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is hereb y: ORDERED that Petitioners shall file and serve any additional materials with which they intend to support their petition for confirmation by April 7, 2020. Respondent's opposition, if any, is due on May 5, 2020. Petitioner's reply, if any, is due on May 12, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners shall serve a copy of this Order on Respondent. (Responses due by 5/5/2020 Replies due by 5/12/2020.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/16/2020) (rro)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to J.H. Reid General Contractor..(pne)
March 13, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
March 13, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
March 13, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,, . Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J.H. Reid General Contractor, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,,. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marimon, Nicole)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19096716).Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund. (Attachments: #1 2001-2006 Independent Agreement, #2 Effectuating & Signatories Page, #3 Interim Compliance Agreement, #4 2011-2015 Independent Agreement, #5 Collection Policy, #6 Notice of Hearing, #7 Arbitration Award, #8 History Bill, #9 Proposed Judgment).(Marimon, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. J.H. Reid General Contractor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J.H. Reid General Contractor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The New York City District Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?