Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund et al v. N.B.A. Construction Inc.
Petitioner: Robert Bonanza, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund and Anna Gutsin
Respondent: N.B.A. Construction Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02242
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: N.B.A. Construction Inc. answer due 7/9/2020. Replies due by 7/16/2020. (jwh)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Application GRANTED. Petitioners' deadline to file and serve their materials in support of the petition to confirm the arbitration award is extended to June 26, 2020. Responses are due by July 9, 2020; Replies due by July 16, 2020. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 7. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/27/2020) (jwh)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Haluk Savci, Esq. dated March 26, 2020. Document filed by Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Petitioners shall file and serve any additional materials with which they intend to support their petition to confirm by March 26, 2020. Respondent's opposition, if any, is due on April 9, 2020. Petitioners reply, if any, is due April 16, 2020. Petitioners shall serve the petition and all supporting papers, as well as this Order, upon Respondents electronically and by overnight mail no later than March 26, 2020, and shall file an affidavit of such service with the court no later than March 27, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 4/9/2020, Replies due by 4/16/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/13/2020) (jca)
March 13, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED. The document was a duplicate filing. (dnh)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to N.B.A. Construction Inc...(dnh)
March 13, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 13, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
March 13, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to N.B.A. Construction Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Robert Bonanza, Anna Gutsin, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Robert Bonanza, Anna Gutsin, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Savci, Haluk)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19099778).Document filed by Robert Bonanza, Anna Gutsin, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund et al v. N.B.A. Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Bonanza
Represented By: Haluk Savci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund
Represented By: Haluk Savci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anna Gutsin
Represented By: Haluk Savci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: N.B.A. Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?