Diaz et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Diaz, Dionicio O Diaz and Ogalis R Diaz
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02317
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Accordingly, it appears that plaintiffs' counsel has abandoned the case. The Court therefore hereby dismisses the case without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/17/2020) (jwh)
April 16, 2020 NOTICE: The Dial in information for the telephonic conference on April 17, 2020 at 11:00 am: USA Toll Free: 888-363-4735 Access code: 1086415 International caller paid: 215-446-3657. (tro)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/17/2020 on a teleconference line to be arranged at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/3/2020) (jwh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Monsanto Company..(pne)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Monsanto Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dionicio O Diaz, Ogalis R Diaz..(Rheingold, Paul)
March 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul D. Rheingold. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code Orange; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to Bronx; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
March 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Paul D. Rheingold to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rheingold, Paul) Modified on 3/17/2020 (jgo).
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19125137)Document filed by Dionicio O Diaz, Ogalis R Diaz..(Rheingold, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionicio O Diaz
Represented By: Paul D. Rheingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ogalis R Diaz
Represented By: Paul D. Rheingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?