Uber, Inc. v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Uber, Inc.
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02320
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 NOTICE: Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, conferences with the Court in civil cases will be held by teleconferencing until further notice. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) shall arrange for the conference call. Each scheduled conference will take place on the date and time originally set. The conference in this case is scheduled for May 26, 2020 at 11:45 a.m. No later than seventy-two hours before the conference, plaintiff(s) counsel shall: (a) docket a letter on ECF to the Court with copy to all opposing counsel containing the call-in information and email the letter to castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov; and (b) for an initial pretrial conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. (Nacanther, Florence)
May 11, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Gianni P. Servodidio dated May 11, 2020 re: Pre-Motion Letter for proposed Motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Uber Technologies, Inc...(Servodidio, Gianni)
May 11, 2020 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Uber Technologies, Inc...(Servodidio, Gianni)
May 11, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Remi James David Jaffre on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc...(Jaffre, Remi)
May 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Micah Creelan on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc...(Creelan, Jeremy)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gianni P. Servodidio on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc...(Servodidio, Gianni)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff Uber, Inc. ("Uber") and Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. ("Uber Technologies"), through their respective counsel, as follows: The parties described herein are in mutual agreement that Defendant Uber Technologies' time to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter shall extend to and include May 11, 2020, in order to facilitate settlement discussions in advance of Defendant Uber Technologies' retention of outside counsel. No previous extension of time has been requested in this matter. (Uber Technologies, Inc. answer due 5/11/2020.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/7/2020) (jwh)
April 7, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Uber, Inc...(Leichtman, David)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/26/2020 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/1/2020) (jwh)
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Uber Technologies, Inc. served on 3/20/2020, answer due 4/10/2020. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent. Document filed by Uber, Inc...(Leichtman, David)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Uber Technologies, Inc...(jgo)
March 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Leichtman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Uber, Inc.; Uber Technologies, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was removed. (jgo)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Leichtman, David)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Leichtman, David) Modified on 3/17/2020 (jgo).
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Uber, Inc...(Leichtman, David)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Leichtman, David) Modified on 3/17/2020 (jgo).
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Uber Technologies, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Uber, Inc...(Leichtman, David)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Leichtman, David)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19126629)Document filed by Uber, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14).(Leichtman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uber, Inc. v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uber, Inc.
Represented By: David Leichtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Gianni P. Servodidio
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Represented By: Remi James David Jaffre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?