Barouk v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Barouk and Batsheva Barouk
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc, Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. and Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02324
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
March 25, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
March 25, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020; Zimmer US, Inc. served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020; Zimmer, Inc. served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. Service was accepted by Faegre Baker Daniels, Lead Counsel. Document filed by Batsheva Barouk..(Nigh, Daniel)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer, Inc...(jgo)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer US, Inc...(jgo)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc...(jgo)
March 17, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 18-md-2859. (jgo)
March 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
March 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Nigh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
March 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Nigh. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of State;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Rockland;. (jgo)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Batsheva Barouk..(Nigh, Daniel)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer US, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Batsheva Barouk..(Nigh, Daniel)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Batsheva Barouk..(Nigh, Daniel)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-md-2859. Document filed by Batsheva Barouk..(Nigh, Daniel)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nigh, Daniel)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19127184)Document filed by Batsheva Barouk..(Nigh, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barouk v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Batsheva Barouk
Represented By: Daniel Nigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?