Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC v. PTI USA et al
Plaintiff: Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC and PTI USA
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2020cv02392
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:45
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 27 ***EX-PARTE***SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . Yoram Nachimovsky. Document filed by Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #24 .(Nachimovsky, Yoram)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #25 Letter filed by Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Court notes that Plaintiff exhibits a lack of diligence by requesting an extension at 4:56 P.M. on the original due date, when the basis for the request (staff furloughs) should have been immediately apparent. Although Defendant does not consent, the Court sees no prejudice in granting an extension. Given the procedural posture of this case, any delay is detrimental only to Plaintiff's efforts to seek a preliminary injunction. Plaintiff's supplemental submissions are due by May 15, 2020; Defendant's response, if any, is due by May 22, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/28/2020) (ama)
April 27, 2020 Filing 25 EMERGENCY LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Yoram Nachimovsky dated 4/27/2020 re: Request for Adjournment. Document filed by Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC..(Nachimovsky, Yoram)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff must file a supplemental declaration, clarifying whether Mr. Igra conveyed any information relevant to this case to Mr. Silver, particularly during the meeting, beyond what has already been publicly filed with the Court. If such additional information was conveyed, the declaration should describe the nature of such information, and Plaintiff's counsel must submit a supplemental memorandum explaining whether such information would be independently discoverable in this case. See Bd. of Ed. of City of New York v. Nyquist, 590 F.2d 1241, 1246 (2d Cir. 1979) (explaining that disqualification is warranted where counsel's representation would confer unfair advantage and taint the trial); Med. Diagnostic Imaging, PLLC v. CareCore Nat., LLC, 542 F. Supp. 2d 296, 315 (S.D.N.Y. 2008) (holding that disqualification was not warranted based on counsel's access to confidential information because such information would otherwise be available in discovery and confers no unfair advantage); Tradewinds Airlines, Inc. v. Soros, No. 08-CV-5901, 2009 WL 1321695, at *8 (S.D.N.Y. May 12, 2009) ("An attorney's prior access to relevant but non-discoverable information gives her an unfair advantage in litigation against a former client. By contrast, any attorney representing plaintiff in this case would have access to the information at issue through discovery."). Plaintiff's supplemental submissions are due by April 27, 2020; Defendant may file a response by April 30, 2020. If necessary, Plaintiff may redact any privileged details in its submissions and file the unredacted submissions ex parte and under seal by following this Court's Individual Practices regarding sealing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/22/2020) (ama)
April 17, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY AFFIRMATION of YORAM NACHIMOVSKY in Support re: #20 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel .. Document filed by Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation in Further Support).(Nachimovsky, Yoram)
April 13, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIRMATION of Jonathan Silver in Opposition re: #20 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel .. Document filed by PTI USA..(Silver, Jonathan)
April 7, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . . Document filed by Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC..(Nachimovsky, Yoram)
April 7, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . Document filed by Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit).(Nachimovsky, Yoram)
April 2, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Abrar A. Khan in Opposition re: #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by PTI USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit March 25, 2020 letter from PTI, #2 Exhibit Memorandum of Agreement).(Silver, Jonathan)
March 31, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Telephone Conference held on 3/31/2020. Attorney Yoram Nachimovsky present for Plaintiff. Attorney Jonathan Silver present for Defendant. Court Reporter present. (anc)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the hearing on Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is continued pending the determination of Mr. Silver's status as defense counsel. Plaintiff's motion for disqualification is due by April 7, 2020. Defendant PTI USA must either respond to the motion by April 14, 2020, or retain new counsel and instruct incoming counsel to file an appearance by that date, which would moot the motion for disqualification. If PTI USA does not retain new counsel, Plaintiff must file any reply by April 17, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 4/7/2020, Responses due by 4/14/2020, Replies due by 4/17/2020.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/31/2020) (jca)
March 27, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Mohammad Akram in Opposition re: #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by PTI USA..(Silver, Jonathan)
March 25, 2020 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #14 Amended Complaint, against John Doe, PTI USA with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC. Related document: #14 Amended Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's formation documents, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's FARA registration).(Nachimovsky, Yoram)
March 25, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Yoram Nachimovsky to RE-FILE Document No. #14 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. The PDF must be titled to correspond with the event type used 'Amended Complaint'. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
March 25, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIRMATION of Yoram Nachimovsky, Esq. re: #1 Complaint, . Document filed by Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit email exchanges).(Nachimovsky, Yoram)
March 24, 2020 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against John Doe, PTI USA with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's formation documents, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's FARA registration).(Nachimovsky, Yoram) Modified on 3/25/2020 (jgo).
March 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 3/30/2020. (jwh)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the hearing is adjourned to March 31, 2020, at 11:00 A.M. All parties must appear for the hearing by calling (888) 363-4749, using the access code 3121171. Plaintiff must effect and file proof of service of this Order by March 25, 2020, and Defendants must file responsive papers by 5:00 P.M. on March 30, 2020. The parties may jointly request a further extension, if necessary, by filing a request on ECF. (Show Cause Hearing set for 3/31/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Telephone Conference set for 3/31/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/23/2020) (jwh)
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Mohammad Akram in Opposition re: #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by PTI USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit suspension notice, #2 Exhibit show cause notice, #3 Exhibit election results).(Silver, Jonathan)
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIRMATION of Jonathan Silver in Opposition re: #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by PTI USA..(Silver, Jonathan)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Silver on behalf of PTI USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit attorneys affirmation, #2 Affidavit clients Declaration, #3 Exhibit Notice of suspension of Imran Igra, #4 Exhibit Show Cause letter to Imran Igra, #5 Exhibit Election results).(Silver, Jonathan)
March 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Yoram Nachimovsky to RE-FILE Document #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Use the event type Affirmation (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers. (ldi)
March 19, 2020 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email with Cease & Desist letter).(Nachimovsky, Yoram) Modified on 3/23/2020 (ldi).
March 19, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nachimovsky, Yoram)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC..(Nachimovsky, Yoram)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of OSC, Complaint, ECF Doc. 4 served on Mohammed Akram on 03/19/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit email sent 03-19-20, #2 Exhibit UPS receipt).(Nachimovsky, Yoram)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: WHEREAS Plaintiff has moved for a preliminary injunction; and WHEREAS a telephonic hearing has been scheduled for March 24, 2020, at 10:30 A.M.; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT all parties must appear for the hearing by calling (888) 363-4749, using the access code 3121171. As previously ordered, Plaintiff must effect and file proof of service by March 19, 2020, and Defendants must file responsive papers by 5:00 P.M. on March 23, 2020. SO ORDERED., ( Telephone Conference set for 3/24/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/19/2020) (ama)
March 19, 2020 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Yoram Nachimovsky for noncompliance with Section 14.2 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (pc)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served on Mohammed Akram on 03/18/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC..(Nachimovsky, Yoram)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER" filed by PTI USA. It is hereby ordered that the above named defendant show cause before this Court at a telephone conference in the City County and State of New York on March 24, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in the forenoon thereof. It is further ordered that service of a copy of this order and annexed complaint upon the Defendants' officers by March 19, 2020 by e-mail on or before noon shall be deemed good and sufficient service thereof. Plaintiff must post proof of service by 5:00 p.m. on March 19, 2020 service must be by overnight carrier on PT I USA and by e-mail. Defendants shall file responsive papers not later than 5:00 P.M.on March 23, 2020. The Court will put a call-in number in advance at the hearing on ECF. So Ordered. (Show Cause Hearing set for 3/24/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) Show Cause Response due by 3/23/2020. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/18/2020) (js)
March 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(jgo) (pne).
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe, PTI USA. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401257084)Document filed by Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC..(jgo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Affidavit Imran Igra) (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC v. PTI USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pakistan Tehreek-E-Insaf USA LLC
Represented By: Yoram Nachimovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PTI USA
Represented By: Yoram Nachimovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?