Irving H. Picard v. James Greiff
Plaintiff: Irving H. Picard
Defendant: James Greiff
In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02560
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Referring Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: WHEREAS, on June 4, 2020, the Court denied Defendant's motion to withdraw the bankruptcy reference (Dkt. No. 9). It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the case. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/15/2020) (cf)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION AND ORDER re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4357A, 08-1789A (SMB). filed by James Greiff. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion to withdraw the bankruptcy reference is DENIED.The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket No. 1. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/4/2020) (cf)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Arthur H. Ruegger in Support re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4357A, 08-1789A (SMB).. Document filed by James Greiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trustee's Ex-Parte Application, #2 Exhibit B - Order on Application, #3 Exhibit C - Case Management Order).(Ruegger, Arthur)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4357A, 08-1789A (SMB). . Document filed by James Greiff..(Ruegger, Arthur)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Nicholas J. Cremona in Opposition re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4357A, 08-1789A (SMB).. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Transcript of Feb. 20, 2020 Pre-Trial Conference).(Cremona, Nicholas)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4357A, 08-1789A (SMB). . Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Cremona, Nicholas)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's Motion to Withdraw the Bankruptcy Reference (Dkt. No. 1) by April 20, 2020. ( Responses due by 4/20/2020) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/6/2020) (cf)
April 2, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Katherine Polk Failla is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
March 30, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Lewis J. Liman is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Arthur H. Ruegger in Support re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4357A, 08-1789A (SMB).. Document filed by James Greiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I).(bkar)
March 25, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
March 25, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4357A, 08-1789A (SMB).Document filed by James Greiff. (Attachments: #1 Defendant Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Proposed Order).(bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irving H. Picard v. James Greiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Greiff
Represented By: Arthur H. Ruegger
Represented By: Carole Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving H. Picard
Represented By: Nicholas J. Cremona
Represented By: David J. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?