Sacher et al v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Susan Sacher and Joel Sacher
Defendant: Exactech, Inc. and Exactech US, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02562
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The parties should submit a Rule 26(f) report by May 29, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/18/2020) (ks)
May 15, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Answer served on Plaintiff on 5/15/20. Document filed by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc...(Davanzo, Jeanine)
May 15, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc...(Davanzo, Jeanine)
May 15, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Exactech US, Inc...(Davanzo, Jeanine)
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Exactech, Inc...(Davanzo, Jeanine)
May 13, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Exactech US, Inc. served on 3/31/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. Service was accepted by Lynn Hammond, Managing Agent. Document filed by Susan Sacher; Joel Sacher..(Wolk, Ilana)
May 13, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Exactech, Inc. served on 4/1/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. Service was accepted by Service Box (COVID19). Document filed by Susan Sacher; Joel Sacher..(Wolk, Ilana)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/17/2020) Exactech US, Inc. answer due 5/29/2020; Exactech, Inc. answer due 5/29/2020 (ks)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jeanine Marie Davanzo on behalf of Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc.. New Address: Gallo Vitucci Klar, 90 Broad Street, 12th Fl, New York, New York, USA 10004, 212-683-7100..(Davanzo, Jeanine)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Jeannine Davanzo dated 4/16/20. Document filed by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc...(Davanzo, Jeanine)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Krystina Rose Maola on behalf of Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc...(Maola, Krystina)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeanine Marie Davanzo on behalf of Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc...(Davanzo, Jeanine)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Exactech US, Inc...(pc)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Exactech, Inc...(pc)
March 26, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 26, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 26, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 26, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ilana Samantha Wolk. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 245 (Tort Product Liability);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 365 (Personal Inj. Prod. Liability);. (pc)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EXACTECH US, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joel Sacher, Susan Sacher..(Wolk, Ilana)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EXACTECH, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joel Sacher, Susan Sacher..(Wolk, Ilana)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wolk, Ilana)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19227898)Document filed by Susan Sacher, Joel Sacher..(Wolk, Ilana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sacher et al v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech, Inc.
Represented By: Krystina Rose Maola
Represented By: Jeanine Marie Davanzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech US, Inc.
Represented By: Krystina Rose Maola
Represented By: Jeanine Marie Davanzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Sacher
Represented By: Ilana Samantha Wolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Sacher
Represented By: Ilana Samantha Wolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?