Namorato v. Town Sports International, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mary Namorato, Farin Greber, Jay Clarke, Judith Sosa, Anna Molly and Larry Kernan
Defendant: Town Sports International Holdings, Inc. and Town Sports International, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02580
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Town Sports International Holdings, Inc. for Town Sports International, LLC. Document filed by Town Sports International, LLC..(Siachos, Peter)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file any amended complaint by June 1, 2020. It is unlikely that Plaintiffs will have a further opportunity to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if no amended complaint is filed, Plaintiffs shall serve any opposition to the motion to dismiss by June 10, 2020. Defendant Town Sports International, LLC's reply, if any, shall be served by June 24, 2020. At the time any reply is served, the moving party shall supply Chambers with two courtesy copies of all motion papers pursuant to my Individual Rules by mailing or delivering them to the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED., ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2020.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/12/2020) (ama)
May 11, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c). Document filed by Town Sports International Holdings, Inc...(Siachos, Peter)
May 11, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Document filed by Town Sports International Holdings, Inc...(Siachos, Peter)
May 11, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Peter G. Siachos, Esq. in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Town Sports International Holdings, Inc., Town Sports International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Namorato Membership Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Molly Membership Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Greber Membership Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Sosa Membership Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Clarke Membership Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Kernan Membership Agreement, #7 Exhibit G - TSI Members Letter).(Siachos, Peter)
May 11, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Town Sports International Holdings, Inc., Town Sports International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Siachos, Peter)
May 11, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Document filed by Town Sports International Holdings, Inc., Town Sports International, LLC..(Siachos, Peter)
May 6, 2020 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Town Sports International, LLC, Other Affiliate New York Sports Clubs, Other Affiliate Boston Sports Clubs, Other Affiliate Washington Sports Clubs, Other Affiliate Philadelphia Sports Clubs for Town Sports International Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by Town Sports International Holdings, Inc...(Siachos, Peter)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Town Sports International Holdings, Inc., Town Sports International, LLC..(Siachos, Peter)
May 4, 2020 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Amended Complaint, RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT DUE MAY 5, 2020 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Peter G. Siachos, Esq. dated May 4, 2020. Document filed by Town Sports International Holdings, Inc., Town Sports International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Chain Between Counsel).(Siachos, Peter)
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Town Sports International Holdings, Inc. served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. Service was accepted by Tammy Alexander, Authorized Agent. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jay Clarke; Anna Molly; Farin Greber; Judith Sosa; Mary Namorato; Larry Kernan..(Gottlieb, David)
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Town Sports International, LLC served on 4/20/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty. Document filed by Jay Clarke; Anna Molly; Farin Greber; Judith Sosa; Mary Namorato; Larry Kernan..(Crabill, Taylor)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allyson A. Avila on behalf of Town Sports International Holdings, Inc., Town Sports International, LLC..(Avila, Allyson)
April 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter George Siachos on behalf of Town Sports International Holdings, Inc., Town Sports International, LLC..(Siachos, Peter)
April 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Evan Gottlieb. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Anna Molly, Jay Clarke, Larry Kernan, Farin Greber, Judith Sosa. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Town Sports International Holdings, Inc., Town Sports International, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jay Clarke, Anna Molly, Farin Greber, Judith Sosa, Mary Namorato, Larry Kernan. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Gottlieb, David)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR- AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Mary Namorato, Anna Molly, Jay Clarke, Larry Kernan, Farin Greber, Judith Sosa with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Anna Molly, Jay Clarke, Larry Kernan, Farin Greber, Judith Sosa. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Gottlieb, David) Modified on 4/9/2020 (pne).
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Town Sports International, LLC..(jgo)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Town Sports International Holdings, Inc...(jgo)
March 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Evan Gottlieb. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mary Namorato. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
March 27, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 27, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Taylor Crabill on behalf of Mary Namorato..(Crabill, Taylor)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Town Sports International Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mary Namorato..(Gottlieb, David)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Town Sports International, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mary Namorato..(Gottlieb, David)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gottlieb, David)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Town Sports International Holdings, Inc., Town Sports International, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19240075)Document filed by Mary Namorato..(Gottlieb, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Namorato v. Town Sports International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town Sports International Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Peter George Siachos
Represented By: Allyson A. Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town Sports International, LLC
Represented By: Peter George Siachos
Represented By: Allyson A. Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Namorato
Represented By: Taylor Crabill
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farin Greber
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Clarke
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Sosa
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Molly
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Kernan
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?