Donetz v. Port Authority Trans Hudson Corp.
Plaintiff: Michael Donetz
Defendant: Port Authority Trans Hudson Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02581
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Defendant's motion to adjourn the initial pretrial conference, ECF No. 9, is GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for June 1, 2020, is ADJOURNED to July 13, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. By July 6, 2020, the parties shall file their joint letter and proposed case management plan. The conference shall proceed telephonically; the parties are each directed to call either (888) 398-2342 or (215) 861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 9. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/13/2020) (cf)
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (6/1/20 Initial Conference) addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Matthew Malysa, Esq. dated May 11, 2020. Document filed by Port Authority Trans Hudson Corp...(Malysa, Matthew)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Malysa on behalf of Port Authority Trans Hudson Corp...(Malysa, Matthew)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Port Authority Trans Hudson Corp. waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. Document filed by Michael Donetz..(Wietzke, Marc)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/1/2020) (mml)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/1/2020 at 12:20 PM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/1/2020) (jwh) Modified on 4/2/2020 (jwh).
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Port Authority Trans Hudson Corp...(jgo)
March 27, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 27, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wietzke, Marc)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Port Authority Trans Hudson, Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Donetz..(Wietzke, Marc)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Port Authority Trans Hudson Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19240077)Document filed by Michael Donetz..(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donetz v. Port Authority Trans Hudson Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port Authority Trans Hudson Corp.
Represented By: Matthew Malysa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Donetz
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?