El Omari v. Buchanan et al
Plaintiff: Oussama El Omari
Defendant: Andrew D. Frank, Amir Ali Handjani, Intelligence Online, James E. D. Buchanan, KARV Communications, Inc., Andrew D. Solomon, Longview Partners (Guernsey) Ltd, Neil Gerrard, Amirali Handjani and Dechert LLP
Case Number: 1:2020cv02601
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against James E. D. Buchanan, Dechert LLP, Andrew D. Frank, Neil Gerrard, Amir Ali Handjani, Intelligence Online, KARV Communications, Inc., Longview Partners (Guernsey) Ltd with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Oussama El Omari. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Article, #2 Exhibit 2) Advertising Teaser).(Moore, Scott)
May 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Scott Michael Moore to RE-FILE Document No. #28 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected (Longview Partners (Guernsey) Ltd) was not selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
May 4, 2020 Filing 30 EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: #28 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott)
May 4, 2020 Filing 29 EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: #28 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott)
May 4, 2020 Filing 28 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against James E. D. Buchanan, Dechert LLP, Andrew D. Frank, Neil Gerrard, Amir Ali Handjani, Intelligence Online, KARV Communications, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Oussama El Omari. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Moore, Scott) Modified on 5/5/2020 (pc).
April 8, 2020 Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Scott M. Moore, Esq. dated April 8, 2020 re: Status of Service of Process. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott)
March 31, 2020 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Neil Gerrard..(jgo)
March 31, 2020 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Longview Partners (Guernsey) Ltd..(jgo)
March 31, 2020 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to KARV Communications, Inc...(jgo)
March 31, 2020 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James E. D. Buchanan..(jgo)
March 31, 2020 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Intelligence Online..(jgo)
March 31, 2020 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dechert LLP..(jgo)
March 31, 2020 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew D. Frank..(jgo)
March 31, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amir Ali Handjani..(jgo)
March 30, 2020 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Longview Partners (Guernsey) Ltd, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott)
March 30, 2020 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KARV Communications, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott)
March 30, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Intelligence Online, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott)
March 30, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amir Ali Handjani a/k/a Amirali Handjani, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott)
March 30, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Neil Gerrard, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott)
March 30, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew D. Frank a/k/a Andrew D. Solomon, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott)
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dechert LLP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott)
March 30, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James E. D. Buchanan, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott)
March 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Scott Michael Moore to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption must list all of the parties. If all of the parties do not fit, use leading party name followed by 'et al'; second party name on the PDF 'To' section must include 'care of c/o' or 'via' (Doc. 3). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
March 30, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 30, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Michael Moore. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: James Edward Buchanan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Longview Partners (Guernsey) Ltd, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott) Modified on 3/30/2020 (jgo).
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KARV Communications, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott) Modified on 3/30/2020 (jgo).
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Intelligence Online, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott) Modified on 3/30/2020 (jgo).
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amir Ali Handjani a/k/a Amirali Handjani, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott) Modified on 3/30/2020 (jgo).
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Neil Gerrard, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott) Modified on 3/30/2020 (jgo).
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew D. Frank a/k/a Andrew D. Solomon, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott) Modified on 3/30/2020 (jgo).
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dechert LLP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott) Modified on 3/30/2020 (jgo).
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James E. D. Buchanan, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oussama El Omari..(Moore, Scott) Modified on 3/30/2020 (jgo).
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Moore, Scott)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Edward Buchanan, Dechert LLP, Andrew D. Frank, Neil Gerrard, Amir Ali Handjani, Intelligence Online, KARV Communications, Inc., Longview Partners (Guernsey) Ltd. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19249084)Document filed by Oussama El Omari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Intelligence Online Article, #2 Exhibit 2 - Intelligence Online Article Advertising Teaser).(Moore, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El Omari v. Buchanan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew D. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amir Ali Handjani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intelligence Online
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. D. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARV Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew D. Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longview Partners (Guernsey) Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Gerrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amirali Handjani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dechert LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oussama El Omari
Represented By: Scott Michael Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?