Fracht FWO Inc. v. TPR Holdings LLC
Plaintiff: Fracht FWO Inc.
Defendant: TPR Holdings LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02706
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331cm
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Steven Taitz, Esq. dated May 20, 2020 re: Fracht FWO, Inc.. Document filed by Fracht FWO Inc...(Taitz, Steven)
May 18, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Scott L. Swanson dated May 18, 2020., LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss; Clarification addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Scott L. Swanson dated May 18, 2020. Document filed by TPR Holdings LLC..(Swanson, Scott)
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TPR Holdings LLC served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. Service was accepted by Secretary of State. Document filed by Fracht FWO Inc...(Taitz, Steven)
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TPR Holdings LLC..(jgo)
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TPR Holdings, LLC, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Fracht FWO Inc...(Leinoff, Michael)
April 3, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fracht FWO Inc...(Leinoff, Michael)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Leinoff, Michael)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against TPR Holdings LLC. Document filed by Fracht FWO Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Terms & Conditions, #2 Exhibit Statement of Account).(Leinoff, Michael)
April 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven Taitz to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the deficiency for the initial pleading has to be corrected before an Amended Complaint is accepted by the Court; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; the Civil Cover sheet must be filed separately using the Civil Cover Sheet event and Rule 7.1 must be filed separately using the Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement event. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Fracht FWO Inc..Document filed by Fracht FWO Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Terms & Conditions, #2 Exhibit Statement of Account, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Rule 7.1 Statement).(Taitz, Steven) Modified on 4/3/2020 (jgo).
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Lester P. Taroff, Esq.. Document filed by Fracht FWO Inc...(Taitz, Steven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of of Appearance of Linda D. Calder Esq.. Document filed by Fracht FWO Inc...(Taitz, Steven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Taitz on behalf of Fracht FWO Inc...(Taitz, Steven)
April 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Scott Leinoff. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $429332000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9999000;. (jgo)
April 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michael Scott Leinoff. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
April 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael Scott Leinoff to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Fracht FWO Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19294305)Document filed by Fracht FWO Inc...(Leinoff, Michael) Modified on 4/2/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fracht FWO Inc. v. TPR Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fracht FWO Inc.
Represented By: Michael Scott Leinoff
Represented By: Steven Taitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPR Holdings LLC
Represented By: Scott Lewis Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?