American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Buckmiller Automatic Sprinkler Corp. et al
Plaintiff: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Defendant: The Pretzvel Corp., Buckmiller Auto Sprinkler Corp. and Buckmiller Automatic Sprinkler Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02711
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Buckmiller Auto Sprinkler Corp., Buckmiller Automatic Sprinkler Corp., The Pretzvel Corp.. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(O'Connor, Maureen)
April 3, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Buckmiller Auto Sprinkler Corp...(pc)
April 3, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Buckmiller Automatic Sprinkler Corp...(pc)
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Pretzvel Corp...(pc)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Connor, Maureen)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Pretzvel Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buckmiller Auto Sprinkler Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buckmiller Automatic Sprinkler Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen)
April 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Maureen Elizabeth O'Connor to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): second party name on the PDF 'To' section must include 'care of c/o' or 'via';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
April 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Maureen Elizabeth O'Connor. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
April 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Maureen Elizabeth O'Connor to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Pretzvel Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) Modified on 4/2/2020 (jgo).
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buckmiller Auto Sprinkler Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) Modified on 4/2/2020 (jgo).
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buckmiller Automatic Sprinkler Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) Modified on 4/2/2020 (jgo).
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Group for American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Connor, Maureen) Modified on 4/2/2020 (jgo).
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckmiller Auto Sprinkler Corp., Buckmiller Automatic Sprinkler Corp., The Pretzvel Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19295758)Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Buckmiller Automatic Sprinkler Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Maureen Elizabeth O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pretzvel Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckmiller Auto Sprinkler Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckmiller Automatic Sprinkler Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?