Trader v. SeatGeek, Inc.
Plaintiff: William Trader
Defendant: SeatGeek, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03248
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. This action remains stayed in its entirety pending the parties' efforts to resolve the dispute through mediation. The parties are hereby ordered to continue filing joint updates every ninety days, with the next status letter due on December 1, 2020. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/13/2020) (va)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: granting 21 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting 21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. This case is STAYED pending the parties' attempts to resolve this matter. The parties are directed to provide joint updates every 3 months regarding the status of mediation. The first update is due on December 1, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/26/2020) (ama)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference is adjourned to September 18, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The parties' joint submissions are due by September 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/9/2020) Initial Conference set for 9/18/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (ks)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trader v. SeatGeek, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SeatGeek, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Trader
Represented By: Nicholas Alexander Coulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?